Katz et al v. Global Aerospace, Inc.
Plaintiff: Melissa Silver and Drew Katz
Defendant: Nancy Michelle de Vries and Global Aerospace, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018mc91303
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Referring Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
September 4, 2018 Filing 26 Transcript of Status Conference held on August 28, 2018, before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. The Transcript may be purchased through Janice Russell at trussell31@tdsmail.com, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. No Reporter. Digital Recording transcribed by Janice Russell. Redaction Request due 9/25/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 30, 2018 Filing 25 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The plaintiffs' motion to compel (Dkt. No. #1 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted with respect to all documents and communications in Global's underwriting file(s) bearing on or relating to the employment status of the pilot defendants. To the extent any of these documents and communications are withheld by Global on the grounds that they are privileged, Global shall contemporaneously to that production provide the plaintiffs a privilege log, specifying the privilege claim asserted, a brief explanation of the privilege claim and the author/recipient of any particular document or communication. The motion to compel is otherwise denied. Global's cross motion to quash the subpoena (Dkt. No. #7 ) is ALLOWED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is denied with respect to any non-privileged documents and communications in its underwriting file(s) bearing on or relating to the employment status of the pilot defendants. The motion is allowed in all other requests. Defendants' joint motion to transfer or in the alternative to quash (Dkt. No. #8 ) is moot in light of the court's rulings on plaintiffs' motion to compel (Dkt. No. #1 ) and Global's cross motion to quash (Dkt. No. #7 ), and therefore denied on that ground. Associated Cases: 1:18-mc-91303-DJC, 1:16-cv-11380-DJC(Russo, Noreen)
August 28, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #1 (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Altman, Roy)
August 28, 2018 Filing 23 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Status Conference held on 8/28/2018. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
August 27, 2018 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING (TIME ONLY) Status Conference set for 8/28/2018 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen)
August 24, 2018 Filing 21 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/28/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen)
August 24, 2018 Filing 20 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Time permitting, the court will hear argument relating to the Global Aerospace subpoena at the August 28th Status Conference. At this juncture the court does not seek additional briefing. (Russo, Noreen)
August 23, 2018 Filing 19 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added William T. Corbett. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew)
August 22, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William T. Corbett Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7285994 by Global Aerospace, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Graceffa, John)
August 6, 2018 Filing 17 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell Motions referred: #1 , #8 Joint MOTION to Quash or to Transfer on behalf of Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. (Hourihan, Lisa) Motions referred to Donald L. Cabell.
August 3, 2018 Filing 16 Letter from John P. Graceffa (Counsel). (McKillop, Matthew)
July 31, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicollette B. Dailey on behalf of Global Aerospace, Inc. (Dailey, Nicollette)
July 31, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Graceffa on behalf of Global Aerospace, Inc. (Graceffa, John)
July 17, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
July 17, 2018 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:18-mc-22309.
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE is before the Court on a Joint Motion to Change Venue to District of Massachusetts #10 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion #10 , the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, the Motion #10 is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is instructed to TRANSFER this case to the District of Massachusetts. The Court suspends all deadlines pending transfer. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/16/2018. (cce)
July 13, 2018 Filing 10 Agreed MOTION to Change Venue TO MOTION TO COMPEL SUBPOENA DIRECTED AT GLOBAL AEROSPACE, INC., AND TO SUSPEND CURRENT BRIEFING DEADLINES by Drew Katz, Melissa Silver. Responses due by 7/27/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marks, Steven)
July 9, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 Joint MOTION to Quash or to Transfer on behalf of Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Drew Katz, Melissa Silver. (Marks, Steven)
July 6, 2018 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Quash or to Transfer on behalf of Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Nancy Michelle de Vries. Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party Nancy Michelle de Vries(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Mullins, Edward)
June 29, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion to Compel/Cross-Motion to Quash and/or for Protective Order by Global Aerospace, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Anthony Moschetta, Esq. In support of Global Aerospace, Inc's Opposition to Motion to Compel/Cross-Motion to Quash and/or for Protective Order)(Joy, John)
June 29, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Aerospace, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent GAUM Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Munich Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate Northern States Agency, Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Global Aerospace, Inc. (Joy, John)
June 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Patrick Joy on behalf of Global Aerospace, Inc.. Attorney John Patrick Joy added to party Global Aerospace, Inc.(pty:dft). (Joy, John)
June 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Drew Katz, Melissa Silver re 2 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Notice of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Marks, Steven)
June 11, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (ail)
June 8, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. (ail)
June 8, 2018 Filing 1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District . Filing fee $47.00 receipt number 113C-10721191, filed by Drew Katz, Melissa Silver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Marks, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katz et al v. Global Aerospace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Silver
Represented By: Kristina Marie Infante
Represented By: Roy Kalman Altman
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Katz
Represented By: Kristina Marie Infante
Represented By: Roy Kalman Altman
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Michelle de Vries
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Aerospace, Inc.
Represented By: John Patrick Joy
Represented By: John P. Graceffa
Represented By: Nicollette B. Dailey
Represented By: William T. Corbett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?