Sampaio v. Smith et al

Petitioner: Norma Sampaio
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielson, Matthew Whitaker and Yolanda Smith
Case Number: 1:2019cv10024
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting #10 Motion to Dismiss (Urso, Lisa)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Petition by Yolanda Smith.(Kanwit, Thomas)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Hearing set for 1/15/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kanwit on behalf of Yolanda Smith (Kanwit, Thomas)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 Letter for the First Circuit Court of Appeals (18-2162). Case Transferred to the District of Massachusetts. (Paine, Matthew)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 Remark. Copy of Petition #1 and Order #5 emailed to US Attorney's Office on 1/7/2019 (Farquhar, R. & Martin, K.) and receipt acknowledged. Paper copy of the same left in Clerk's office for pick-up by US Attorney's Office (per usual business practice) and mailed to Respondent Smith. (PSSA, 3)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Yolanda Smith, Superintendent of the Suffolk County House of Correction and Petitioner's immediate custodian, shall be substituted as the sole respondent. The Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of this Order and the Petition upon (i) Superintendent Smith; and (ii) the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. Respondent shall, no later than Monday, January 14, 2019, show good cause why the Petition should not be granted. In order to give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts pending the adjudication of this action. (PSSA, 3)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT of the USCA as to Norma Sampaio (18-2162): Petitioner Norma Sampaio has filed a petition for review of an expedited removal order entered pursuant to 8 U.S.C. 1225(b)(1), along with a motion for stay of removal. The government opposes the stay and also has moved for dismissal, citing Pena v. Lynch, 815 F.3d 452, 457 (9th Cir. 2016). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631 and 8 U.S.C. 1252(e)(2), the petition and the stay motion are transferred to the District Court for the District of Massachusetts. We leave it to the district court to determine in the first instance whether and to what extent it may exercise habeas jurisdiction over the matter and to resolve promptly the request for stay of removal. Further, we express no opinion as to the merits of petitioner's challenge(s). (Paine, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2019: #1 USCA Record, Petition, and Motion) (Paine, Matthew).
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Norma Sampaio (Danieli, Chris)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Norma Sampaio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Danieli, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sampaio v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Yolanda Smith
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Norma Sampaio
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?