Freitas-Pacheco v. Smith

Petitioner: Graciane Lopes Freitas-Pacheco
Respondent: Mr. Todd Lyons, Sheriff STEVEN W TOMPKINS, Yolanda Smith, Secretary Kirstjen M NIELSEN, Matthew G Whitaker, Kirstjen M NIELSEN, STEVEN W TOMPKINS and Todd Lyons
Case Number: 1:2019cv10035
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Paine, Matthew)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #6 First MOTION to Withdraw Habeas Petition.Now before the Court is petitioner's motion to withdraw habeas petition. In the motion, petitioner's counsel states that petitioner Graciane Lopes Freitas-Pacheco was released from immigration detention on January 10, 2019. The Court treats the motion as one for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.Accordingly, the Court allow's the petitioner's motion to withdraw and ORDERS this action dismissed without prejudice.SO ORDERED.... (Paine, Matthew)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kanwit on behalf of Yolanda Smith (Kanwit, Thomas)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Withdraw Habeas Petition by Graciane Lopes Freitas-Pacheco.(Rubin, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Yolanda Smith, Superintendent of the South Bay House of Correction, shall be the sole respondent in this action. The Respondent shall, within 21 days of the date of this order, respond to the petition. Petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts without providing the Court 48 hours' advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. (PSSA, 4)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7483267 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Graciane Lopes Freitas-Pacheco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Rubin, Jeffrey) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/9/2019) (Paine, Matthew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freitas-Pacheco v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mr. Todd Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff STEVEN W TOMPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Yolanda Smith
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Kirstjen M NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew G Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen M NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STEVEN W TOMPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Graciane Lopes Freitas-Pacheco
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?