Ralph v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Plaintiff: Cherie Ralph
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America, Apple Inc. Long Term Disability Plan and Cigna Group Insurance
Case Number: 1:2019cv10037
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Parsons, Katherine)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Cigna Group Insurance by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Parsons, Katherine)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal of the Plan by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Parsons, Katherine)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Parsons, Katherine)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine R. Parsons on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Parsons, Katherine)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Crevier on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Crevier, David)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cherie Ralph. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Sullivan, M.)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. Long Term Disability Plan, Cigna Group Insurance, Life Insurance Company of North America. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Nici, Richard)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (adminn, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7483650 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Cherie Ralph. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Category Form)(Sullivan, M.) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/9/2019) (Paine, Matthew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ralph v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: David B. Crevier
Represented By: Katherine R. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc. Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Ralph
Represented By: M. Katherine Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?