Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT
Defendant: Pan Am Railways and Springfield Terminal Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv10045
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. (Montes, Mariliz)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit declaration)(Naumes, Robert) Modified on 2/15/2019 bu detaching memorandum in support and re-docketing as a new entry (Montes, Mariliz).
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael A. Pavlick. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael A. Pavlick Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7532173 by Pan Am Railways and Springfield Terminal Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael A. Pavlick in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Parker, Kathleen)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard S. Edelman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Pan Am Railways and Springfield Terminal Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Parker, Kathleen)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Pan Am Railways and Springfield Terminal Railway Company.(Parker, Kathleen)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pan Am Railways and Springfield Terminal Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Pan Am Systems, Inc. for Pan Am Railways and Springfield Terminal Railway Company.. (Parker, Kathleen)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard S. Edelman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7526041 by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Naumes, Christopher)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Pan Am Railways and Springfield Terminal Railway Company served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Naumes, Robert)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Complete Service by 4/9/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pan Am Railways and Springfield Terminal Railway Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT against Pan Am Railways and Springfield Terminal Railway Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7484620 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Naumes, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT
Represented By: Christopher C. Naumes
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Represented By: Robert T. Naumes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan Am Railways and Springfield Terminal Railway Company
Represented By: Michael A. Pavlick
Represented By: Kathleen Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?