Kaplan et al v. Wayfair Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marilyn Goodstein and Iain Kaplan
Defendant: Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc., Michael D. Fleisher and Steven K. Conine
Consolidated Plaintiff: Michael McKenzie
Case Number: 1:2019cv10062
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to #24 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc.. (Braceras, Roberto)
October 17, 2019 Filing 29 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #28 Defendants' Assented to Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' Reply Brief shall be filed no later than 11/12/2019 and the reply brief shall not be redundant of the brief in support of the motion to dismiss and address only matters raised in plaintiff's opposition which were not reasonably foreseeable when their initial brief in support of the motion to dismiss was filed. (Beatty, Barbara)
October 17, 2019 Filing 28 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc..(Bullerjahn, Caroline)
October 11, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Iain Kaplan. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
August 30, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION re #24 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint by Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Bullerjahn, Caroline)
August 30, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc.. (Braceras, Roberto)
August 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint by Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc..(Braceras, Roberto)
August 29, 2019 Filing 23 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #22 Assented to Motion for Leave of Court to Exceed Page Limit. (Beatty, Barbara)
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc..(Bullerjahn, Caroline)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws against Steven K. Conine, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc., Michael D. Fleisher, filed by Iain Kaplan.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
April 30, 2019 Filing 20 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: SCHEDULING ORDER - Consolidated amended complaint to be filed by 7/1/2019 and defendants to file responsive pleading no later than 9/6/2019. (See Order for further details.)(Beatty, Barbara)
April 8, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION (Joint) and [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc.. (Bullerjahn, Caroline)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Iain Kaplan. (Kinsella, Devan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Iain Kaplan in Support re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel IAIN KAPLANS MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL filed by Iain Kaplan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
March 11, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel IAIN KAPLANS MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL filed by Iain Kaplan. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Counsel IAIN KAPLANS MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL ( Responses due by 3/25/2019) by Iain Kaplan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, and Establish a Briefing Schedule. (Beatty, Barbara)
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, and Establish a Briefing Schedule (Proposed Order) by Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc..(Bullerjahn, Caroline)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wayfair Inc.. (Bullerjahn, Caroline)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian J. Stearns on behalf of Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc. (Stearns, Ian)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline T. Bullerjahn on behalf of Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc. (Bullerjahn, Caroline)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto M. Braceras on behalf of Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc. (Braceras, Roberto)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Marilyn Goodstein. Michael D. Fleisher served on 1/19/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Marilyn Goodstein. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Marilyn Goodstein. Steven K. Conine served on 1/19/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Marilyn Goodstein. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Marilyn Goodstein. Niraj Shah served on 1/19/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Marilyn Goodstein. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Marilyn Goodstein. Wayfair Inc. served on 1/19/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Marilyn Goodstein. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Caruso, Stephanie)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Caruso, Stephanie)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7488843 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Marilyn Goodstein. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/11/2019 to flatten Category Form PDF) (Caruso, Stephanie).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaplan et al v. Wayfair Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Goodstein
Represented By: Theodore M. Hess-Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iain Kaplan
Represented By: Theodore M. Hess-Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niraj Shah
Represented By: Caroline T. Bullerjahn
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Represented By: Ian J. Stearns
Represented By: Caroline H. Bullerjahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayfair Inc.
Represented By: Caroline T. Bullerjahn
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Represented By: Ian J. Stearns
Represented By: Caroline H. Bullerjahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Fleisher
Represented By: Caroline T. Bullerjahn
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Represented By: Ian J. Stearns
Represented By: Caroline H. Bullerjahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven K. Conine
Represented By: Caroline T. Bullerjahn
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Represented By: Ian J. Stearns
Represented By: Caroline H. Bullerjahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael McKenzie
Represented By: Jeffrey C Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?