Elliot v. DaVita, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Elliot
Defendant: DaVita, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10063
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Hourihan, Lisa)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Pursuant to 16.1(d). (Summer, David)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (Blake, Daniel)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DaVita, Inc.. (Blake, Daniel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by DaVita, Inc..(Blake, Daniel)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Kinsella, Devan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DaVita, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7489443 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Blake, Daniel).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliot v. DaVita, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Elliot
Represented By: David B. Summer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DaVita, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?