King et al v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

Plaintiff: Alice King and James C. King
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10065
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 17 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss (unopposed) ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (McDonagh, Christina)
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss (unopposed) by Wells Fargo Bank N.A..(Higgins, Sean)
February 18, 2019 Filing 15 Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alice King, James C. King. (Clifford, Scott)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to 2/18/19 to file opposition to motion to dismiss. (Folan, Karen)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 18, 2019 to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Alice King, James C. King.(Clifford, Scott)
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record Wells Fargo Bank N.A. summons served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Notice to AG re 93A Complaint, #4 Notice of Removal)(McDonagh, Christina)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Higgins, Sean)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank N.A..(Higgins, Sean)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wells Fargo Bank N.A. answer due 1/25/2019. (Folan, Karen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Friday, January 25, 2019 to File Answer by Wells Fargo Bank N.A..(Higgins, Sean)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Kinsella, Devan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Higgins on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Higgins, Sean)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank N.A... (Lowe, Matthew)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew N. Lowe on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Lowe, Matthew)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7489788 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Lowe, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Matthew N. Lowe
Represented By: Sean R. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice King
Represented By: Scott J. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. King
Represented By: Scott J. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?