Lawrence v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Vinieta Lawrence
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC and Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv10067
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 27 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to April 13, 2019 to Enlarge Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint (Folan, Karen)
February 21, 2019 Filing 26 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 13, 2019 to Enlarge Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint by Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC.(Stephens, Christian)
February 7, 2019 Filing 25 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is DENIED and the temporary restraining order will not be further extended. (Pacho, Arnold)
February 5, 2019 Filing 24 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Hearing held on 2/5/2019. Court takes matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Sullivan, Stephens) (Folan, Karen)
February 5, 2019 Filing 23 Second MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 Final MOTION for Extension of Time to February 4, 2019 to Hold Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Extend Temporary Restraining Order filed by Vinieta Lawrence. (Sullivan, Gregory)
February 5, 2019 Filing 22 First MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 Final MOTION for Extension of Time to February 4, 2019 to Hold Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Extend Temporary Restraining Order , #11 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to January 29, 2019 to Conduct Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed filed by Vinieta Lawrence. (Sullivan, Gregory)
February 4, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, filed by Vinieta Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Sullivan, Gregory)
February 4, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, filed by Vinieta Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Sullivan, Gregory)
January 30, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULINGHearing reset for 2/5/2019 12:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs and the Temporary Restraining Order entered in this matter by the Superior Court for Norfolk County shall be extended to 2/5/2019. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 29, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULINGHearing reset for 2/4/2019 04:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
January 29, 2019 Filing 17 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Plaintiff's Final Motion for Extension of Time Until February 4, 2019 to Hold Hearing On Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Extend Temporary Restraining Order [ECF No. 16] is GRANTED. The Temporary Restraining Order entered in this matter by the Superior Court for Norfolk County shall be extended to February 4, 2019. (Folan, Karen)
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 Final MOTION for Extension of Time to February 4, 2019 to Hold Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Extend Temporary Restraining Order by Vinieta Lawrence.(Sullivan, Gregory)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 First MOTION for Extension ENLARGE MOTION (McDonagh, Christina)
January 24, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension ENLARGE MOTION by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC.(Kaplan, Harrison) Modified on 1/24/2019 (McDonagh, Christina).
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Temporary Restraining Order entered in this matter by the Superior Court for Norfolk County shall be extended to 1/31/2019.(McDonagh, Christina)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time.Motion Hearing reset for 1/31/2019 09:15 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to January 29, 2019 to Conduct Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Vinieta Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Appearance as Counsel)(Sullivan, Gregory)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Stephens, Christian)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (Stephens, Christian)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2019 03:30 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. As discussed more fully during the Status Conference held on 1/14/2019, the Temporary Restraining Order entered in this matter by the Superior Court for Norfolk County shall be extended to 1/23/2019. Defendant shall file any submission with the Court by 1/21/2019(McDonagh, Christina)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 1/14/2019. Defendants' consent to continue the TRO until briefed and a hearing can be held. Defendant will file submissions by 1/21/19. Hearing to be held on 1/23/19 at 3:30 p.m. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Stephens) (Folan, Karen)
January 12, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 1/14/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
January 12, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by email (adminn, )
January 12, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (adminn, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Kaplan on behalf of Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC (Kaplan, Harrison)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of New York Mellon Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7490327 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Form)(Stephens, Christian) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/14/2019) (adminn, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2019: #3 Exhibit) (adminn, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinieta Lawrence
Represented By: Gregory M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Harrison J. Kaplan
Represented By: Christian B.W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Represented By: Christian B.W. Stephens
Represented By: Harrison J. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?