Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company v. Leonelli-Elmer et al
Plaintiff: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Defendant: Harold A. Leonelli, Christopher Elmer, Peter Elmer, Christine Leonelli-Elmer and Eric Elmer
Case Number: 1:2019cv10083
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 20 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Scheduling Conference held on 3/14/2019; money to be paid into court with any interest by 3/28/19; ( Status/Settlement Report due by 4/15/2019). (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.)(Attorneys present: Scibelli, Stuntz & Stinger) (Urso, Lisa)
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Stenger, Susan)
March 12, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Scibelli, Anthony)
March 12, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Stuntz, Karen)
March 12, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Scibelli, Anthony)
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #12 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, on extension of time to respond to counterclaim by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Scibelli, Anthony)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Christine Leonelli-Elmer and Harold A. Leonelli by Eric Elmer and Peter Elmer.(Stenger, Susan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Peter Elmer, Eric Elmer, Christopher Elmer, COUNTERCLAIM against Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company by Harold A. Leonelli, Christine Leonelli-Elmer.(Stuntz, Karen)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Christopher Elmer served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (Marcotte, Carolyn)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Peter Elmer served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Marcotte, Carolyn)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Eric Elmer served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Marcotte, Carolyn)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Harold A. Leonelli served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Marcotte, Carolyn)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Christine Leonelli-Elmer served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Marcotte, Carolyn)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn A. Marcotte on behalf of Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company (Marcotte, Carolyn)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Christopher Elmer, Eric Elmer, Peter Elmer, Harold A. Leonelli, Christine Leonelli-Elmer. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lara, Miguel)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lara, Miguel)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Scibelli, Anthony)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7493926 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Scibelli, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company v. Leonelli-Elmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony A. Scibelli
Represented By: Carolyn A. Marcotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold A. Leonelli
Represented By: Karen W. Stuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Elmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Elmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Leonelli-Elmer
Represented By: Karen W. Stuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Elmer
Represented By: Susan E. Stenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?