Johnson v. Home Warranty Administrators, Inc.
Plaintiff: Keyette Johnson
Defendant: Home Warranty Administrators, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10097
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Home Warranty Administrators, Inc. ( A copy of this Notice has been mailed to the Defendant via first and certified mail (#7004 1160 0001 5659 4395) (Attachments: #1 Default Standing Order)(Montes, Mariliz)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 Request for notice of default by Keyette Johnson . (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Lemberg, Sergei)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Home Warranty Administrators, Inc. served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (Lemberg, Sergei)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Complete Service by 4/16/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Home Warranty Administrators, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Home Warranty Administrators, Inc dba Choice Home Warranty Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7496081 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Keyette Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Lemberg, Sergei)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Home Warranty Administrators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyette Johnson
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Warranty Administrators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?