Fredrikson v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC

Plaintiff: Deborah Fredrikson
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10107
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 3/5/2019.(1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings.(2) The Court heard updates on the status of the MDL panel hearing concerning the case removed from Oregon state court.(3) The Court heard updates on Phase 5 discovery in Group 1 cases, including a fully briefed motion to compel in the Fluth case, and the finalization of case selections in Group 2. The Court granted certain extensions of time for discovery, subject to a further written order. (4) The Court heard updates on expert discovery.(5) A colloquy was held about selecting new dates for the rescheduled Daubert causation expert hearing, and about the logistics of the March 14, 2019 Daubert regulatory expert hearing.(6) The Court granted the Proposed Order Regarding New Medical Records Collection Vendor. (7) A colloquy was held about the pending Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice in Kutzer, Case No. 1:15-cv-13751 (Docket No. 88). (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Varios) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Pezzarossi, Lisa)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 30. ORDER GOVERNING SCHEDULING OF PHASE 5, GROUP 1 CASE-SPECIFIC EXPERT DISCOVERY AND DAUBERT AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS(Halley, Taylor)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Stevenson on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline LLC (Stevenson, Jennifer)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GlaxoSmithKline LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; 1:19-cv-10107-FDS Fredrikson v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC. In Re: Zofran (Ondansetron) Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2657. (Danieli, Chris)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Brand Short Form Complaint against GlaxoSmithKline LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7498232 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Deborah Fredrikson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Nabers, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fredrikson v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Fredrikson
Represented By: J. Scott Nabers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?