Santos v. Action Collection Agencies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anderson Santos
Defendant: Steward Emergency Physicians, Inc. and Action Collection Agencies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10108
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Cohen on behalf of Anderson Santos (Cohen, Andrew)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Action Collection Agencies, Inc., Steward Emergency Physicians, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7498538 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Anderson Santos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Miller, Elizabeth) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/22/2019) (Danieli2, Chris). (Attachment 1 & 2 replaced on 1/23/2019 to correct nature of suit) (DaSilva, Carolina).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. Action Collection Agencies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steward Emergency Physicians, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Collection Agencies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anderson Santos
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Miller
Represented By: Andrew P. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?