Ederra Plastic Surgery, P.C. et al v. Cynosure, Inc.

Plaintiff: Hormonal Wellness of La Jolla, Inc., Ederra Plastic Surgery, P.C., Frederick A. Coville, M.D., P.C., JRK Global Inc., Disappearing Ink Affordable Tattoo Removal, LLC, Bernadette Bonaparte, M.D., P.A., Dynamic Body Sculpting, P.C., Sewickley Med Spa, LLC, Littlerock Family Medicine, P.S., American Comprehensive Weight Loss Center, Inc., North Creek Medicine Inc., P.S., Mehmet C. Pekerol M.D., P.C., Skin Perfect Rancho Cucamonga, Inc., Weighless MD LLC, Lash House, LLC, Treasure Coast Cosmetic Enterprises, LLC, Omega Aesthetics, LLC, Plastic Surgery Specialists, P.C., Georges Kaado Medicine, P.C., Marion Anesthesia, P.C., Savannah Facial Plastic Surgery, LLC, Yale Mitchell Kadesky, P.C., Body NV LLC and Orlando Plastic Surgery Center LLC
Defendant: Cynosure, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10164
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 4/8/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-11850-DJC, 1:17-cv-11435-DJC, 1:18-cv-11269-DJC, 1:19-cv-10164-DJC(Hourihan, Lisa)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Status Conference set for 2/21/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLYAssociated Cases: 1:17-cv-11435-DJC, 1:17-cv-11850-DJC, 1:18-cv-11269-DJC, 1:19-cv-10164-DJC(Hourihan, Lisa)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Comprehensive Weight Loss Center, Inc., Sewickley Med Spa, LLC, Omega Aesthetics, LLC, Marion Anesthesia, P.C., JRK Global Inc., Plastic Surgery Specialists, P.C., Ederra Plastic Surgery, P.C., Bernadette Bonaparte, M.D., P.A., Savannah Facial Plastic Surgery, LLC, North Creek Medicine Inc., P.S., Mehmet C. Pekerol M.D., P.C., Disappearing Ink Affordable Tattoo Removal, LLC, Frederick A. Coville, M.D., P.C., Skin Perfect Rancho Cucamonga, Inc., Littlerock Family Medicine, P.S., Weighless MD LLC, Dynamic Body Sculpting, P.C., Lash House, LLC, Georges Kaado Medicine, P.C., Hormonal Wellness of La Jolla, Inc., Orlando Plastic Surgery Center LLC, Yale Mitchell Kadesky, P.C., Body NV LLC, Treasure Coast Cosmetic Enterprises, LLC. Cynosure, Inc. waiver sent on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Barnes, Lauren)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cynosure, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7508208 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by American Comprehensive Weight Loss Center, Inc., Bernadette Bonaparte, M.D., P.A., Body NV LLC, Disappearing Ink Affordable Tattoo Removal, LLC, Dynamic Body Sculpting, P.C., Ederra Plastic Surgery, P.C., Frederick A. Coville, M.D., P.C., Georges Kaado Medicine, P.C., Hormonal Wellness of La Jolla, Inc., JRK Global Inc., Lash House, LLC, Littlerock Family Medicine, P.S., Marion Anesthesia, P.C., Mehmet C. Pekerol M.D., P.C., North Creek Medicine Inc., P.S., Omega Aesthetics, LLC, Orlando Plastic Surgery Center LLC, Plastic Surgery Specialists, P.C., Savannah Facial Plastic Surgery, LLC, Sewickley Med Spa, LLC, Skin Perfect Rancho Cucamonga, Inc., Treasure Coast Cosmetic Enterprises, LLC, Weighless MD LLC, Yale Mitchell Kadesky, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Barnes, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ederra Plastic Surgery, P.C. et al v. Cynosure, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hormonal Wellness of La Jolla, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ederra Plastic Surgery, P.C.
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick A. Coville, M.D., P.C.
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JRK Global Inc.
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disappearing Ink Affordable Tattoo Removal, LLC
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Bonaparte, M.D., P.A.
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynamic Body Sculpting, P.C.
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sewickley Med Spa, LLC
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Littlerock Family Medicine, P.S.
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Comprehensive Weight Loss Center, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Creek Medicine Inc., P.S.
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehmet C. Pekerol M.D., P.C.
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skin Perfect Rancho Cucamonga, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weighless MD LLC
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lash House, LLC
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treasure Coast Cosmetic Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omega Aesthetics, LLC
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plastic Surgery Specialists, P.C.
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georges Kaado Medicine, P.C.
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Anesthesia, P.C.
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savannah Facial Plastic Surgery, LLC
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yale Mitchell Kadesky, P.C.
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Body NV LLC
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Plastic Surgery Center LLC
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynosure, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?