Vcan Bio USA Co., Ltd. v. Nielsen et al
Plaintiff: Vcan Bio USA Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Director Laura B. Zuchowski, Kirstjen M. Nielsen and U.S. Department of Homeland Security Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv10180
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vcan Bio USA Co., Ltd. (Warecki, Nathan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Vcan Bio USA Co., Ltd.. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Vcan Bio USA Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on K. Nielsen, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service on US Dept. of Homeland Security, #3 Exhibit C - Proof of Service on US Citizenship and Immigration Services, #4 Exhibit D - Proof of Service on L. Zuchowski, #5 Exhibit E - Proof of Service on Office of the US Attorney)(Warecki, Nathan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Poswistilo on behalf of Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Citizenship and Immigration Services, Laura B. Zuchowski (Poswistilo, Susan)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Citizenship and Immigration Services, Laura B. Zuchowski. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kinsella, Devan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vcan Bio USA Co., Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent VcanBio Cell & Gene Engineering Corporation, Ltd. for Vcan Bio USA Co., Ltd... (Warecki, Nathan)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Review of Agency Action Under The Administrative Procedure Act against Laura B. Zuchowski, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Citenzenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen M NIELSEN Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7512182 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Vcan Bio USA Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Category Form)(Warecki, Nathan). (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/28/2019 due to incomplete original filing) (Kinsella, Devan). (Additional attachment(s) added per request of counsel on 1/28/2019: #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D) (Kinsella, Devan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vcan Bio USA Co., Ltd. v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vcan Bio USA Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Nathan P. Warecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Laura B. Zuchowski
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?