Louis v. Legal Sea Foods, LLC

Plaintiff: Patrick Louis
Defendant: Legal Sea Foods, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10218
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 Copy re #11 Memorandum & ORDER, mailed to Patrick Louis on 3/19/2019. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. The Motion to Remand [ECF No. #9 ] is DENIED. Louis' requests for attorney's fees and Rule 11 sanctions are also DENIED. If the Plaintiff continues to want this case to proceed in state court, he must move to dismiss his federal claims, otherwise the case will be litigated in federal court. SO ORDERED.(McDonagh, Christina)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Legal Sea Foods, LLC. (Lamkin, Brian)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Pursuant to 28 USC 1446(b) by Patrick Louis.(McDonagh, Christina)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 State Cover Sheet, #2 State Summons, #3 State Service Notice, #4 State Motion to Dismiss, #5 State Response, #6 State Response Ex 1, #7 State Response Ex 2, #8 State Response Ex 3, #9 State Response Ex 4, #10 State Response Ex 5, #11 State Memo to Request, #12 State Motion, #13 State Reply to Motion, #14 State Exhibit list, #15 State Amended Complaint, #16 State Removal, #17 State Docket Maintenance, #18 State Docket Report)(McDonagh, Christina)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 Letter/request (non-motion) from Unknown. (McDonagh, Christina)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended Complaint) by Legal Sea Foods, LLC.(Lamkin, Brian)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Halley, Taylor)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie B. Brennan on behalf of Legal Sea Foods, LLC (Brennan, Julie)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Legal Sea Foods, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Legal Sea Foods Holdings Co., Inc. for Legal Sea Foods, LLC.. (Lamkin, Brian)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Legal Sea Foods, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7521206 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Civil Action Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Order on Motion for More Definite Statement, #4 Exhibit State Court Docket Entries, #5 Exhibit State Court First Amended Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Sheet)(Lamkin, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louis v. Legal Sea Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Sea Foods, LLC
Represented By: Julie B. Brennan
Represented By: Brian H. Lamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?