Camobreco v. IBM Corporation

Plaintiff: Adam Camobreco
Defendant: IBM Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv10242
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by IBM Corporation. (Kessler, Jamie)
April 4, 2019 Filing 22 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Halley, Taylor)
April 3, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The scheduling conference set for 2:00 pm on April 8, 2019 is cancelled. The court to notify counsel of alternate dates. (Lyness, Paul)
April 3, 2019 Filing 20 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion to Continue (Lyness, Paul)
March 29, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief by IBM Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Kessler, Jamie)
March 20, 2019 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION to Continue Or Stay The April 8, 2019 Scheduling Conference to such time that the Court has ruled on IBMs pending Motion to Dismiss by IBM Corporation.(Kessler, Jamie)
March 19, 2019 Filing 17 Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #7 MOTION for Discovery Rule 56(d) filed by Adam Camobreco. (Miller, Judith)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 Judge George A. O'Toole, JrElectronic Order entered finding as MOOT #4 Motion to Dismiss in light of filing of amended complaint and GRANTING #15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to March 22, 2019 to oppose motion to dismiss amended complaint (Halley, Taylor)
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to March 22, 2019 to oppose motion to dismiss amended complaint by Adam Camobreco.(Miller, Judith)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added JUSTIN R. BARNES AND KELLI N. CHURCH. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kelli N. Church & Justin R. Barnes Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7572247 by IBM Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelli N. Church, #2 Declaration of Justin R. Barnes)(Kessler, Jamie)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by IBM Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kessler, Jamie)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by IBM Corporation.(Kessler, Jamie)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 Opposition re #7 MOTION for Discovery Rule 56(d) filed by IBM Corporation. (Kessler, Jamie)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly.(Lyness, Paul)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT Record. (Halley, Taylor)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Discovery Rule 56(d) by Adam Camobreco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Miller, Judith)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Adam Camobreco. (Miller, Judith)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against IBM Corporation, filed by Adam Camobreco.(Miller, Judith)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by IBM Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Defendant International Business Machine Corporation's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss)(Kessler, Jamie)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by IBM Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7528552 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Kessler, Jamie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/6/2019) (Jones, Sherry). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/6/2019) (Jones, Sherry).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camobreco v. IBM Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Camobreco
Represented By: Judith A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBM Corporation
Represented By: Jamie L. Kessler
Represented By: Kelli Church
Represented By: Justin Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?