Elliott v. Segal et al

Plaintiff: Jody Elliott
Defendant: Judge Honor Segal, Rosalin Acosta and Karen Andreas
Case Number: 1:2019cv10259
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rosalin Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Shapiro, Rachel)
April 11, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Rosalin Acosta.(Shapiro, Rachel)
April 3, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Karen Andreas. (Hall, Emma)
April 3, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Karen Andreas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Hall, Emma)
April 2, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous With Certificate of Service With Certificate of Service filed by Judge Honor Segal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Essex Superior Court Elliot v. City of Salem, et al., #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Essex Superior Court Elliot v. Segal, et al., #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Suffolk Superior Court Elliot v. Baker, et al.)(Gediman, Scott)
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous With Certificate of Service by Judge Honor Segal. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gediman, Scott)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Judge Honor Segal answer due 4/2/2019. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 2, 2019 to File Answer With Certificate of Service by Judge Honor Segal.(Gediman, Scott)
March 11, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiff's corrections to Defendant Rosalyn Acosta's Motion re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 11, 2019 to File Responsive Pleading filed by Jody Elliott. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Judge Honor Segal served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Karen Andreas served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (McDonagh, Christina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2019: #1 Exhibit) (McDonagh, Christina).
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to 4/11/19 to file a responsive pleading. (Folan, Karen)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 11, 2019 to File Responsive Pleading by Rosalin Acosta.(Shapiro, Rachel)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ( Responses due by 4/3/2019); granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Karen Andreas answer due 4/3/2019. (McDonagh, Christina)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 3, 2019 to File Response/Reply to Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to April 3, 2019 to File Answer ( Responses due by 3/13/2019) by Karen Andreas.(Hall, Emma)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karen Andreas. Karen Andreas waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Hall, Emma)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma D. Hall on behalf of Karen Andreas (Hall, Emma)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Copy re #3 Summons Issued and Civil Docket Sheet, mailed to Jody Elliott on 2/11/2019. (Lara, Miguel)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee/payment: $400.00, receipt number 1BST072891 for #1 Complaint (Coppola, Katelyn)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lara, Miguel)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jody Elliot. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet and Category Form, #2 Exhibit(s)) (Lara, Miguel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Segal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Honor Segal
Represented By: Scott Gediman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosalin Acosta
Represented By: Rachel M. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Andreas
Represented By: Emma D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?