SHANGHAI ZHANGJIANG BOSTON ENTERPRISE PARK, INC. v. Neilsen et al
Plaintiff: SHANGHAI ZHANGJIANG BOSTON ENTERPRISE PARK, INC.
Defendant: Secretary DHS Kirstjen Neilsen, Director Laura B. Zuchowski, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Laura B. Zuchowski
Case Number: 1:2019cv10264
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Shanghai Zhangjiang Boston Enterprise Park, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica P. Driscoll on behalf of Kirstjen Neilsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Laura B. Zuchowski (Driscoll, Jessica)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shanghai Zhangjiang Boston Enterprise Park, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shanghai Zhangjiang Boston Enterprise Park, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shanghai Zhangjiang Boston Enterprise Park, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Shanghai Zhangjiang Boston Enterprise Park, Inc.. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 2/13/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Drago, Anthony)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
February 13, 2019 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund re #1 Complaint,, for $400.00 paid on 02/12/2019, receipt number 0101-7536261. (Adam, Lucien)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Review under the APA against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7537882 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by SHANGHAI ZHANGJIANG BOSTON ENTERPRISE PARK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Category Form, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drago, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHANGHAI ZHANGJIANG BOSTON ENTERPRISE PARK, INC. v. Neilsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary DHS Kirstjen Neilsen
Represented By: Jessica P. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Laura B. Zuchowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jessica P. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Jessica P. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura B. Zuchowski
Represented By: Jessica P. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANGHAI ZHANGJIANG BOSTON ENTERPRISE PARK, INC.
Represented By: Anthony Drago, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew J. Maiona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?