McIsaac v. Foster Wheeler Energy Corp et al
Plaintiff: John T McIsaac and Irene McIsaac
Defendant: York International Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Electro Dynamic Corporation, Harsco Corporation f/k/a The Patterson-Kelley Co., Inc., Roper Industries, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., FMC, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Inc., BW/IP International, Inc., as Successor to Byron Jackson Pumps, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Metropolitan Life Ins. Co., IMO Industries Inc., Crane Co., The Gorman-Rupp Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Crane Co, as Successor to Cochrane Corp., Graver Technologies LLC, Flowserve Corporation, Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Foster Wheeler Energy Corp, A.W. Chesterton Company, General Electric Company, Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Taco, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc. Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Nibco, Inc., Marotta Controls, Inc., Eckel Industries, Inc., Grundfos Water Utility, API Heat Transfer Inc., Grinnell LLC, Quaker Chemical Corporation, Ross Heat Exchanger Division of American Standard, Inc., Process Engineering and Machine Co., Inc., John Crane, Inc., Elliot Company, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Marshall Engineered Products Company, LLC, Carrier Corporation a/k/a Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc., Cornell Pump Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., ITT Corporation, Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Eastern Refractories Company, Inc., Roth Pump Company, Viad Corp. as Successor to Griscom Russell, Bayer CropScience Inc., Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., f/k/a DUNHAM-BUSH, INC., Union Carbide Corporation, Marmon Wire & Cable LLC, Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. f/k/a Jamesbury Corporation, Yuba Heat Transfer LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Uniroyal Inc., Aurora Pump Co., Flowserve US, Inc., Alfa Laval, Inc. and API Heat Transfer Electric Heater Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv10282
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Referring Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 154 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quaker Chemical Corporation. (Jackson, Susan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 153 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Jackson, Susan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 152 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. f/k/a Jamesbury Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Metso USA for Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. f/k/a Jamesbury Corporation.. (Jackson, Susan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Jackson on behalf of Quaker Chemical Corporation (Jackson, Susan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Jackson on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Jackson, Susan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Jackson on behalf of Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. f/k/a Jamesbury Corporation (Jackson, Susan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Jackson on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Jackson, Susan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 147 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Armstrong International, Inc..(Jackson, Susan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 146 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(Jackson, Susan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 145 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. f/k/a Jamesbury Corporation.(Jackson, Susan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 144 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant Carrier Corporation f/k/a Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
April 12, 2019 Filing 143 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carrier Corporation a/k/a Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
April 8, 2019 Filing 142 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marshall Engineered Products Company, LLC. (Egan, John)
April 8, 2019 Filing 141 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., f/k/a DUNHAM-BUSH, INC.. (Egan, John)
April 8, 2019 Filing 140 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Marshall Engineered Products Company, LLC. (Egan, John)
April 8, 2019 Filing 139 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Fort Kent Holdings, Inc f/k/a Dunham-Bush, LLC. (Egan, John)
April 8, 2019 Filing 138 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., f/k/a DUNHAM-BUSH, INC., Marshall Engineered Products Company, LLC.(Egan, John)
April 8, 2019 Filing 137 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
April 8, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by John Egan on behalf of Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., f/k/a DUNHAM-BUSH, INC., Marshall Engineered Products Company, LLC (Egan, John)
April 8, 2019 Filing 135 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Warren Pumps LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
April 8, 2019 Filing 134 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Marmon Wire & Cable, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
April 8, 2019 Filing 133 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marmon Wire & Cable LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
April 8, 2019 Filing 132 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Graver Technologies LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
April 8, 2019 Filing 131 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Graver Technologies LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
April 5, 2019 Filing 130 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Inc.. (Dwyer, Paul)
April 5, 2019 Filing 129 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FMC. (Dwyer, Paul)
April 4, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Watts on behalf of Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Inc. (Watts, Clint)
April 4, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Watts on behalf of FMC (Watts, Clint)
April 4, 2019 Filing 126 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Inc..(Dwyer, Paul)
April 4, 2019 Filing 125 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC.(Dwyer, Paul)
April 4, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Inc. (Dwyer, Paul)
April 4, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of FMC (Dwyer, Paul)
April 2, 2019 Filing 122 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Taco, Inc.. (Young, Kevin)
April 2, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Young on behalf of Taco, Inc. (Young, Kevin)
April 1, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE: 1:19-cv-10593-WGY Sebright v. General Electric Company et al has been added as a related case to the Massachusetts Asbestos Litigation cases. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-10593-WGY et al.(Putnam, Harold)
April 1, 2019 Filing 118 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 4/1/2019. Court reviews 4/1/2019 Agenda with counsel. Of note is that, by agreement, all stays shall be lifted in the following cases: Drummond, 16-11614, Laporte, 17-11004, Studebaker, 17-12237, Medeiros, 17-12516, and Estes, 18-10101. In Cupp, 18-10168, court modifies fact discovery closure date to 9/30/2019. Also, Sebright, 19-10593, to be added as a related case to the Massachusetts Asbestos Litigation cases. Further date set. (Status Conference set for 6/4/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler.). (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Shepard, Landry, Conserve, Armato, Jackson, Chambers, et al) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11532-RWZ et al.(Putnam, Harold)
March 29, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Marino Landry on behalf of Irene McIsaac, John T McIsaac (Landry, Andrea)
March 29, 2019 Filing 116 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc. Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation identifying Corporate Parent GAMCO Investors, Inc. for CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc. Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation.. (Moccia, Anthony)
March 29, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M. Moccia on behalf of CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc. Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation (Moccia, Anthony)
March 27, 2019 Filing 114 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BW/IP International, Inc., as Successor to Byron Jackson Pumps identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for BW/IP International, Inc., as Successor to Byron Jackson Pumps.. (O'Neil, Shannon)
March 27, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon M. O'Neil on behalf of BW/IP International, Inc., as Successor to Byron Jackson Pumps (O'Neil, Shannon)
March 27, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. McCarthy on behalf of BW/IP International, Inc., as Successor to Byron Jackson Pumps (McCarthy, Daniel)
March 25, 2019 Filing 111 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Uniroyal Inc.. (Brenner, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Brenner on behalf of Uniroyal Inc. (Brenner, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2019 Filing 109 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Warren Pumps LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 21, 2019 Filing 108 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and answer to all, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Harsco Corporation f/k/a The Patterson-Kelley Co., Inc..(Deyoe, Jessica)
March 21, 2019 Filing 107 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harsco Corporation f/k/a The Patterson-Kelley Co., Inc.. (Deyoe, Jessica)
March 21, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L. Deyoe on behalf of Harsco Corporation f/k/a The Patterson-Kelley Co., Inc. (Deyoe, Jessica)
March 21, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Liaison Counsel (Armato, Stephen)
March 21, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Liaison Counsel (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
March 20, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance Attorney Katharine S. Perry terminated. (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 20, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE: 1:19-cv-10282-NMG McIsaac v. Foster Wheeler Energy Corp et al has been added as a related case to the Massachusetts Asbestos Litigation cases. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11532-RWZ et al.(Putnam, Harold)
March 20, 2019 Filing 102 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 4/1/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
March 19, 2019 Filing 101 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A.W. Chesterton Company. (McVinney, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. McVinney on behalf of A.W. Chesterton Company (McVinney, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Filing 99 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roper Industries, Inc.. (Souza, Kristen)
March 18, 2019 Filing 98 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 15, 2019 Filing 97 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler Referred for: Full Pretrial, Dispositive Motions (ptd). (asbestos case) (Lima, Christine)
March 15, 2019 Filing 96 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 15, 2019 Filing 95 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
March 14, 2019 Filing 94 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 14, 2019 Filing 93 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IMO Industries Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 14, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin K. Smith on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corp (Smith, Kaitlin)
March 14, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin K. Smith on behalf of Cornell Pump Company (Smith, Kaitlin)
March 14, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin K. Smith on behalf of Roper Industries, Inc. (Smith, Kaitlin)
March 14, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin K. Smith on behalf of Yuba Heat Transfer LLC (Smith, Kaitlin)
March 14, 2019 Filing 88 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Gardner Denver, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 13, 2019 Filing 87 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Viad Corp. as Successor to Griscom Russell.(Netburn, Peter)
March 11, 2019 Filing 86 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 7, 2019 Filing 85 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Viking Pump, Inc..(DeLuzio, Maria)
March 7, 2019 Filing 84 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Answer to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Spirax Sarco, Inc..(DeLuzio, Maria)
March 7, 2019 Filing 83 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to All Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(DeLuzio, Maria)
March 5, 2019 Filing 82 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 5, 2019 Filing 81 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant, Viking Pump, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 5, 2019 Filing 80 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Viking Pump, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 25, 2019 Filing 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Electro Dynamic Corporation. (DiMarco, Erik)
February 25, 2019 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Electro Dynamic Corporation.(DiMarco, Erik)
February 25, 2019 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Yuba Heat Transfer LLC.(Souza, Kristen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Roper Industries, Inc..(Souza, Kristen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 75 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cornell Pump Company.(Souza, Kristen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 74 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3). (Lancer, Michaela)
February 25, 2019 Filing 73 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eckel Industries, Inc.. (Lancer, Michaela)
February 25, 2019 Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand affirmative defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Eckel Industries, Inc..(Lancer, Michaela)
February 21, 2019 Filing 71 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.. (Martin, Adam)
February 21, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C. Martin on behalf of Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc. (Martin, Adam)
February 21, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni K. Mackler on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. (Mackler, Joni)
February 21, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Lee on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. (Lee, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Vossler on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. (Vossler, Christopher)
February 21, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Bogdanski on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. (Bogdanski, John)
February 21, 2019 Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flowserve US, Inc.. (Claflin, Mark)
February 21, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Claflin on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. (Claflin, Mark)
February 21, 2019 Filing 63 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Foster Wheeler Energy Corp.(Souza, Kristen)
February 20, 2019 Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aurora Pump Co.. (Rasmussen, Shaina)
February 20, 2019 Filing 61 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Aurora Pump Co..(Rasmussen, Shaina)
February 20, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R. Waksler on behalf of Aurora Pump Co. (Waksler, Craig)
February 20, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaina A. Rasmussen on behalf of Aurora Pump Co. (Rasmussen, Shaina)
February 20, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Marmon Wire & Cable LLC (Perritano, Judith)
February 20, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Marmon Wire & Cable LLC (Riordan, Meghan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Marmon Wire & Cable LLC (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 20, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Graver Technologies LLC (Perritano, Judith)
February 20, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Marmon Wire & Cable LLC (Perritano, Judith)
February 20, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
February 20, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Perritano, Judith)
February 20, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of IMO Industries Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
February 20, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Carrier Corporation a/k/a Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
February 20, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Graver Technologies LLC (Riordan, Meghan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Marmon Wire & Cable LLC (Riordan, Meghan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Riordan, Meghan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of IMO Industries Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Carrier Corporation a/k/a Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Graver Technologies LLC (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 20, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Marmon Wire & Cable LLC (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 20, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 20, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 20, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of IMO Industries Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 20, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Carrier Corporation a/k/a Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 20, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Carrier Corporation a/k/a Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 20, 2019 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Yuba Heat Transfer LLC identifying Corporate Parent Connell Limited Partnership for Yuba Heat Transfer LLC.. (Souza, Kristen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen R. Souza on behalf of Yuba Heat Transfer LLC (Souza, Kristen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen R. Souza on behalf of Roper Industries, Inc. (Souza, Kristen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen R. Souza on behalf of Cornell Pump Company (Souza, Kristen)
February 15, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaela E. Lancer on behalf of Harsco Corporation f/k/a The Patterson-Kelley Co., Inc. (Lancer, Michaela)
February 15, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaela E. Lancer on behalf of Eckel Industries, Inc. (Lancer, Michaela)
February 15, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Gardella on behalf of Harsco Corporation f/k/a The Patterson-Kelley Co., Inc. (Gardella, John) (Main Document 30 replaced on 2/21/2019) (Vieira, Leonardo). Modified on 2/21/2019 to upload document with Attorney's signature (Vieira, Leonardo).
February 15, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Gardella on behalf of Eckel Industries, Inc. (Gardella, John) (Main Document 29 replaced on 2/21/2019) (Vieira, Leonardo). Modified on 2/21/2019 to upload document with Attorney's signature (Vieira, Leonardo).
February 15, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E. Shannon on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Shannon, Anne)
February 15, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E. Shannon on behalf of Nibco, Inc. (Shannon, Anne)
February 15, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E. Shannon on behalf of General Electric Company (Shannon, Anne)
February 15, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Stesha A. Emmanuel on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Emmanuel, Stesha)
February 15, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Stesha A. Emmanuel on behalf of Nibco, Inc. (Emmanuel, Stesha)
February 15, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Stesha A. Emmanuel on behalf of General Electric Company (Emmanuel, Stesha)
February 15, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Velan Valve Corp.. (Mohan, Catherine)
February 15, 2019 Filing 21 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Velan Valve Corporation.(Mohan, Catherine)
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Velan Valve Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Velan, Inc. for Velan Valve Corporation.. (Mohan, Catherine)
February 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mohan on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Mohan, Catherine)
February 15, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of NIBCO, Inc.. (Mohan, Catherine)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Nibco, Inc..(Mohan, Catherine)
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nibco, Inc.. (Mohan, Catherine)
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mohan on behalf of Nibco, Inc. (Mohan, Catherine)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Mohan, Catherine)
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Viad Corp. as Successor to Griscom Russell.(Netburn, Peter)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Viad Corp. as Successor to Griscom Russell. (Netburn, Peter)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Netburn on behalf of Viad Corp. as Successor to Griscom Russell (Netburn, Peter)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail. (Pacho, Arnold)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen R. Souza on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corp (Souza, Kristen)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Foster Wheeler Energy Corp re #1 Notice of Removal Notice of No Pending Motions (Perry, Katharine)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Foster Wheeler Energy Corp identifying Corporate Parent JOHN WOOD GROUP plc (Scotland) for Foster Wheeler Energy Corp.. (Perry, Katharine)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine S. Perry on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corp (Perry, Katharine)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Foster Wheeler Energy Corp ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7539425 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Perry, Katharine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2019: #5 Category Form) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 2/14/2019 to attach category form (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIsaac v. Foster Wheeler Energy Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electro Dynamic Corporation
Represented By: Erik C. DiMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harsco Corporation f/k/a The Patterson-Kelley Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jessica L. Deyoe
Represented By: John P. Gardella
Represented By: Michaela E. Lancer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roper Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen R. Souza
Represented By: Kaitlin K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP International, Inc., as Successor to Byron Jackson Pumps
Represented By: Shannon M. O'Neil
Represented By: Daniel P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gorman-Rupp Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co, as Successor to Cochrane Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graver Technologies LLC
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corp
Represented By: Katharine S. Perry
Represented By: Kristen R. Souza
Represented By: Kaitlin K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: Michael F. McVinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Anne E. Shannon
Represented By: Catherine Mohan
Represented By: Stesha A. Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin E. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Susan A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc. Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Anthony M. Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nibco, Inc.
Represented By: Anne E. Shannon
Represented By: Catherine Mohan
Represented By: Stesha A. Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marotta Controls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckel Industries, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Gardella
Represented By: Michaela E. Lancer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grundfos Water Utility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: API Heat Transfer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quaker Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Susan A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Heat Exchanger Division of American Standard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Process Engineering and Machine Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Susan A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Engineered Products Company, LLC
Represented By: John Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation a/k/a Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell Pump Company
Represented By: Kristen R. Souza
Represented By: Kaitlin K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.
Represented By: Adam C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Refractories Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roth Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp. as Successor to Griscom Russell
Represented By: Peter C. Netburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., f/k/a DUNHAM-BUSH, INC.
Represented By: John Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marmon Wire & Cable LLC
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. f/k/a Jamesbury Corporation
Represented By: Susan A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuba Heat Transfer LLC
Represented By: Kristen R. Souza
Represented By: Kaitlin K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Anne E. Shannon
Represented By: Catherine Mohan
Represented By: Stesha A. Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Co.
Represented By: Craig R. Waksler
Represented By: Shaina A. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Represented By: John J. Bogdanski
Represented By: Joni K. Mackler
Represented By: Mark J. Claflin
Represented By: Michael T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: API Heat Transfer Electric Heater Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T McIsaac
Represented By: Andrea Marino Landry
Represented By: Jasmine M. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene McIsaac
Represented By: Andrea Marino Landry
Represented By: Jasmine M. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?