Bright v. TOMPKINS et al

Plaintiff: Julius Knight Bright
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen M NIELSEN and STEVEN W TOMPKINS
Case Number: 1:2019cv10283
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Julius Knight Bright. (Freidel, Irene)
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #10 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause by Julius Knight Bright.(Freidel, Irene)
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Kirstjen M NIELSEN, STEVEN W TOMPKINS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weida, Jason)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) All Defendants. (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 29, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #6 Service Order - 2241 Petition by Kirstjen M NIELSEN, STEVEN W TOMPKINS.(Weida, Jason)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Order entered pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 governing Section 2241 cases for service on respondents. (PSSA, 5)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Pacho, Arnold)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Julius Knight Bright.(Freidel, Irene)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Julius Knight Bright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Freidel, Irene)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7539454 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Julius Knight Bright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Freidel, Irene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bright v. TOMPKINS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Knight Bright
Represented By: Irene C. Freidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen M NIELSEN
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN W TOMPKINS
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?