In Re. Spenlinhauer et al
Trustee: Tort Trustee Lynne F. Riley and John Fitzgerald
Appellant: Ryan Spenlinhauer
Debtor: Robert J. Spenlinhauer
Case Number: 1:2019cv10310
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 Copy re 9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, mailed to Ryan Spenlinhauer on 3/25/2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief. The Court extends the briefing scheduling by 30 days. Appellant's brief is due by April 25, 2019; Appellee's brief is due May 23, 2019; and Appellant's Reply (if any) is due by June 6, 2019. Appellant must inform the court by May 30, 2019, whether he intends to file a Reply brief. (Pacho, Arnold)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for 90 Day Extension of Time to File Brief by Ryan Spenlinhauer. (Pacho, Arnold)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Maynard, Timothy)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Copy re 5 Order, mailed to Ryan Spenlinhauer on 2/22/2019. (McDonagh, Christina)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Bankruptcy Court record having been filed on 2/21/2019, the court orders the following briefing schedule. Appellant's brief is due by March 22, 2019; Appellee's Brief is due by April 19, 2019; and Appellant's Reply brief (if any) is due May 3, 2019. Appellant must inform the court by April 25, 2019, whether he intends to file a Reply brief.(Zierk, Marsha)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Certification) (Pacho, Arnold)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 13-17191. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re. Spenlinhauer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Tort Trustee Lynne F. Riley
Represented By: John T. Morrier
Represented By: David Koha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John Fitzgerald
Represented By: Eric K. Bradford
Represented By: Paula R.C. Bachtell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ryan Spenlinhauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Robert J. Spenlinhauer
Represented By: Gary W. Cruickshank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?