DISH Network L.L.C. et al v. Lopes

Plaintiff: NagraStar LLC and DISH Network L.L.C.
Defendant: Peter Lopes
Case Number: 1:2019cv10327
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:151
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Peter Lopes, filed by DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC.(Szumowski, Patricia)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Peter Lopes served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Szumowski, Patricia)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lara, Miguel)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lara, Miguel)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC identifying Other Affiliate DISH DBS Corporation, Other Affiliate DISH Orbital Corporation for DISH Network L.L.C.; Other Affiliate DISH Network Corporation, Other Affiliate EchoStar Corporation, Other Affiliate Nagra USA Inc. for NagraStar LLC.. (Szumowski, Patricia)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peter Lopes Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7548835 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Szumowski, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISH Network L.L.C. et al v. Lopes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NagraStar LLC
Represented By: Patricia A. Szumowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISH Network L.L.C.
Represented By: Patricia A. Szumowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Lopes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?