Ramhit v. Lyons et al

Plaintiff: Narine Ramhit
Defendant: Acting Atty. General Matthew G Whitaker, Yolanda Smith, Secretary Kirstjen M NIELSEN, Mr. Todd Lyons, Sheriff STEVEN W TOMPKINS, Todd Lyons, Steven W. Tompkins, Matthew G Whitaker and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 1:2019cv10329
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 First MOTION to Dismiss Habeas Petition. (Paine, Matthew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) set for 2/25/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. THE HEARING IS CANCELLED. (Paine, Matthew)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss Habeas Petition by Narine Ramhit.(Rubin, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kanwit on behalf of Todd Lyons, Kirstjen Nielsen, Yolanda Smith, Steven W. Tompkins, Matthew G Whitaker (Kanwit, Thomas)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/11/19 to Respond to Petition by Todd Lyons, Kirstjen Nielsen, Yolanda Smith, Steven W. Tompkins, Matthew G Whitaker.(Kanwit, Thomas)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) :Hearing set for 2/25/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.The Court enters an Order that the petitioner not be removed from the District of MA until further order of the Court. Such order will be entered once the Court is sufficiently satisfied as to this Court's jurisdiction or lack thereof. (Paine, Matthew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. The respondents shall, within 3 days of the date of this order, respond to the petition. The Clerk shall serve a copy of the petition upon the respondents and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts.(PSSA, 4)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Paine, Matthew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Rynne, Michelle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7548949 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Narine Ramhit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Appendix)(Rubin, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramhit v. Lyons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Atty. General Matthew G Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Smith
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen M NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Todd Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff STEVEN W TOMPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Lyons
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven W. Tompkins
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G Whitaker
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narine Ramhit
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?