Cesar Castillo, Inc. v. Ranbaxy Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Cesar Castillo, Inc.
Defendant: Ranbaxy U.S.A. Inc., Ranbaxy Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD. and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10357
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT ALLEN on behalf of Ranbaxy Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. (ALLEN, ROBERT)
April 24, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyla Jackson on behalf of Ranbaxy Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. (Jackson, Kyla)
April 23, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Kanstroom Musgrave on behalf of Ranbaxy Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. (Musgrave, Emily)
April 23, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurence A. Schoen on behalf of Ranbaxy Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. (Schoen, Laurence)
April 23, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda P. Nussbaum on behalf of Cesar Castillo, Inc. (Nussbaum, Linda)
April 19, 2019 Filing 22 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (147) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:15-cv-11828-NMG; finding as moot (25) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:18-cv-12129-NMG; finding as moot (3) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:19-md-02878-NMG; finding as moot (26) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:19-cv-10356-NMG; finding as moot (17) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:19-cv-10357-NMG Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02878-NMG et al.(Lima, Christine)
April 16, 2019 Filing 21 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Corrected MDL ORDER No. 1 entered (as filed in 19md02878). (Lima, Christine)
March 25, 2019 Filing 20 Entered in error by court staff. NEF regenerated.
March 25, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 4/22/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02878-NMG, 1:15-cv-11828-NMG, 1:18-cv-12129-NMG, 1:19-cv-10356-NMG, 1:19-cv-10357-NMG(Lima, Christine)
March 20, 2019 Filing 18 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: MDL ORDER NO. 1 entered. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02878-NMG, 1:15-cv-11828-NMG, 1:18-cv-12129-NMG, 1:19-cv-10356-NMG, 1:19-cv-10357-NMG(Lima, Christine)
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Case Management Order)(Nussbaum, Linda)
February 25, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 DISREGARD ENTERED IN THE WRONG CASE. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number: Initial, MDL No. 2878 has been transferred from Eastern District of New York and assigned civil action number: 19-10357. Eastern District of New York case number: 18-6126. In Re: Celexa and Lexapro Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation, MDL 2067 (Jones, Sherry) Modified on 2/25/2019 (Jones, Sherry).
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:18-cv-06126.
February 22, 2019 Case transferred to District of Massachusetts. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa)
February 22, 2019 Filing 13 Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Massachusetts are transferred to the District of Massachusetts and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Nathaniel M. Gorton for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Florio, Lisa)
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Massachusetts are transferred to the District of Massachusetts and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Nathaniel M. Gorton for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (awaiting receipt of certified copy from the transferee court) (Lee, Tiffeny)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. Ranbaxy Inc. served on 12/10/2018. (Nussbaum, Linda)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 Letter dated 12/27/2018 from Gerald Lawrence to Douglas C. Palmer enclosing courtesy copy of Plaintiff United Food and Commercial Workers Health and Welfare Fund of Northeastern PA's Response in Support of Motion for the Transfer to and Consolidation or Coordination of Related Actions in the Eastern District of New York, which was filed electronically today with the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Marziliano, August)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Service of the Summons and Complaint, endorsed on doc.#8 . SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 12/19/2018. (See document for details.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order regarding service of the summons and complaint and responses thereto by Ranbaxy Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. (Lefkowitz, Jay)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ranbaxy Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate Ranbaxy Laboratories, Ltd. for Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Lefkowitz, Jay)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay P. Lefkowitz on behalf of Ranbaxy Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Lefkowitz, Jay)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 Copy of Motion of Plaintiff Cesar Castillo, Inc. for the Transfer to and Consolidation or Coordination of Related Actions in the Eastern District of New York. Originally filed Before the United States Judicial Panel on Multi district Litigation. (Marziliano, August)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 1, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10896918 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Nussbaum, Linda) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cesar Castillo, Inc. v. Ranbaxy Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranbaxy U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranbaxy Inc.
Represented By: Jay P. Lefkowitz
Represented By: Laurence A. Schoen
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Emily Kanstroom Musgrave
Represented By: ROBERT ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Jay P. Lefkowitz
Represented By: Laurence A. Schoen
Represented By: Kyla Jackson
Represented By: Emily Kanstroom Musgrave
Represented By: ROBERT ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Castillo, Inc.
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?