Dan-Bunkering (Monaco) S.A.M. v. R/V NEPTUNE et al
Plaintiff: Dan-Bunkering (Monaco) S.A.M.
Defendant: R/V NEPTUNE, MG3 (SURVEY) UK LTD. and NEPTUNE EHF
Case Number: 1:2019cv10360
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for vessel arrest attachment and order. R/V Neptune (IMO7504237) served on 3/5/2019: no seizure at this time. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dan-Bunkering (Monaco) S.A.M. (Ouellette, Stephen)
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Service of Process filed by Dan-Bunkering (Monaco) S.A.M.. Individual(s)/Entities served: R/V NEPTUNE. (Ouellette, Stephen)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER for Temporary Restraining Order entered; granting #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Bono, Christine)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN entered; granting #5 Motion to Appoint Custodian. (Bono, Christine)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER for Summons and Process of Attachment and Garnishment entered; granting #3 Motion for Attachment and Garnishment. (Bono, Christine)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 WARRANT OF MARITIME ARREST issued as to R/V Neptune. (Bono, Christine)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER AUTHORIZING ARREST AND DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WARRANT OF ARREST entered; granting #2 Motion for Arrest of Defendant Vessel. (Bono, Christine)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to MG3 (SURVEY) UK LTD., NEPTUNE EHF, R/V NEPTUNE. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION Restraining order by Dan-Bunkering (Monaco) S.A.M.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ouellette, Stephen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Dan-Bunkering (Monaco) S.A.M.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ouellette, Stephen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION Maritime Attachment filed by Dan-Bunkering (Monaco) S.A.M.. (Ouellette, Stephen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Maritime Attachment by Dan-Bunkering (Monaco) S.A.M.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Summons of Attachment)(Ouellette, Stephen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Dan-Bunkering (Monaco) S.A.M.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ouellette, Stephen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7555879 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Dan-Bunkering (Monaco) S.A.M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ouellette, Stephen) Modified on 2/26/2019 to seal 1-1 as it contains personal identifier information (Account#)(Montes, Mariliz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dan-Bunkering (Monaco) S.A.M. v. R/V NEPTUNE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R/V NEPTUNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MG3 (SURVEY) UK LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEPTUNE EHF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan-Bunkering (Monaco) S.A.M.
Represented By: Stephen M. Ouellette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?