Acosta v. Tara Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Defendant: Pedro Pirez and Tara Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10369
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:651
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Henderson, Nathan)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Henderson, Nathan)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of the Service of Summons Executed. Answer due by 4/29/209 (Henderson, Nathan) Modified on 3/29/2019 to correct event used. (Montes, Mariliz).
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by R. Alexander Acosta. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Henderson, Nathan)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Donnelly in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pedro Pirez, Tara Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Dwyer, Daniel) Modified on 3/28/2019 to seal exhibits 1, 3, 6, 7, 8 and 11 as it contains personal identifier information (DOB, SSN, account#) (Montes, Mariliz).
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pedro Pirez, Tara Construction, Inc.. (Dwyer, Daniel)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Pedro Pirez, Tara Construction, Inc..(Dwyer, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan C. Henderson on behalf of R. Alexander Acosta (Henderson, Nathan)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 5/29/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Haran, Jodi)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Lawson, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Tara Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Pirez
Represented By: Daniel J. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Kelly M. Lawson
Represented By: Nathan C. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?