Luistilus Bonnet v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Claude Mary Luistilus Bonnet
Defendant: Steven Tompkins, Mr. Todd Lyons, Yolanda Smith and Todd Lyons
Case Number: 1:2019cv10417
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Hearing re Petition for Habeas Corpus set for 6/11/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 20 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Lara, Miguel)
April 26, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF by Claude Mary Luistilus Bonnet to #15 Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241 unopposed reply to response and opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)
April 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE re 14 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages...Petitioner's reply/opposition is due on 4/26/19 (Molloy, Maryellen)
April 18, 2019 Filing 17 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lara, Miguel)
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Response and Opposition by Claude Mary Luistilus Bonnet.(Holper, Mary)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE/ANSWER to PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Yolanda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Alan Greenbaum Declaration, #2 Exhibit Brown v. Smith, 14-cv-30184-MAP (Sept. 29, 2015) (Order Granting our MTD))(Le, Huy)
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Molloy, Maryellen)
April 9, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Yolanda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Le, Huy)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Huy Le on behalf of Yolanda Smith (Le, Huy)
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 RESET DEADLINES AS TO: Respond to Plaintiff's Petition due by 4/10/2019 (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time 4/10/19 to file a responsive pleading. (Molloy, Maryellen)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 10, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Petition by Yolanda Smith.(Sady, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Yolanda Smith (Sady, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 Remark. Petition and Service Order emailed to US Attorney's Office (D. Mass.) on 3/7/2019. On 3/7/2019, hard copies of the same (1) left in Clerk's Office of District Court for pick-up by US Atttorney's Office, per usual business practice; and (2) mailed to Superintendent Smith. (PSSA, 3)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Superintendent Smith shall be the sole respondent. The Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the Petition upon Superintendent Smith and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. Respondent shall, no later Thursday, March 28, 2019. To give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Petitioner shall not be moved outside the Districts of Massachusetts or New Hampshire without providing the Court 48 hours advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. Any such 48-hour notice period shall commence at the date and time such notice is filed and expire 48 hours later, except "[i]f the period would end on a Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday, the period continues to run until the same time on the next day that is not a Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday." Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a)(2)(C).(PSSA, 3)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Correction to the docket made by Court staff. CORRECTION : Docket No. 3 - deleted as Summons issued in error. A 2241 service order to be issued. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7570490 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Claude Mary Luistilus Bonnet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luistilus Bonnet v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Todd Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Smith
Represented By: Huy Le
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Mary Luistilus Bonnet
Represented By: Mary P. Holper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?