R&R Fabrication Inc. v. Kallidus Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: R&R Fabrication Inc.
Defendant: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland and Kallidus Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10443
Filed: March 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:19-cv-00112.
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to transfer; directing the Clerk to transfer this case to the USDC for the District of Massachusetts. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/11/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 Telephone Conference held on 3/7/2019 before Judge Paula Xinis.(FTR - Ulander - 4C.) (bus, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER ORDER scheduling a telephone conference for Thursday, March 7, 2019 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/6/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts by R&R Fabrication Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lynch, John)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joshua Cohn. Directing attorney Joshua Cohn to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 2/19/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeff D Bernarducci. Directing attorney Jeff D Bernarducci to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 2/19/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua Cohn (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7845241.) by Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland, Kallidus Technologies, Inc.(Farmer, Jessica)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeff D. Bernarducci (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7845207.) by Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland, Kallidus Technologies, Inc.(Farmer, Jessica)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Transfer by Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland, Kallidus Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Divyang Patel ISO MTD, #3 Affidavit of Jessica Farmer ISO MTD, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Request for Hearing)(Farmer, Jessica)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland identifying Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, a Swiss Corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd., a Swiss Corporation for Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland.(Farmer, Jessica)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Kallidus Technologies, Inc. (Farmer, Jessica)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R&R Fabrication Inc.. Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Certified Mail Card)(Lynch, John)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R&R Fabrication Inc.. Kallidus Technologies, Inc. served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Certified Mail Card)(Lynch, John)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by R&R Fabrication Inc. (Lynch, John)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland and Kallidus Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7776638.), filed by R&R Fabrication Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Lynch, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R&R Fabrication Inc. v. Kallidus Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Jeff D. Bernarducci
Represented By: Joshua Cohn
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kallidus Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jeff D. Bernarducci
Represented By: Joshua Cohn
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R&R Fabrication Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Garrett Sawyer
Represented By: John Paul Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?