DiPierro v. Hurwitz et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Dipierro
Defendant: Hugh J. Hurwitz and Deborah G. Schult
Case Number: 1:2019cv10495
Filed: March 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Referring Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 39 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Paine, Matthew)
June 7, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Motion to Dismiss by Stephanie DiPierro (Frederickson, Robert)
May 15, 2019 Filing 37 STATUS REPORT Joint by Stephanie DiPierro. (Frederickson, Robert)
May 9, 2019 Filing 36 Second Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frederickson, Robert)
April 3, 2019 Filing 35 STATUS REPORT by Stephanie DiPierro. (Frederickson, Robert)
April 1, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frederickson, Robert)
March 20, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Stephanie DiPierro. Hugh J. Hurwitz served on 3/15/2019, answer due 5/14/2019; Deborah G. Schult served on 3/15/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. (Frederickson, Robert)
March 20, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Eve A. Piemonte on behalf of Hugh J. Hurwitz, Deborah G. Schult (Piemonte, Eve)
March 20, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Hugh J. Hurwitz, Deborah G. Schult (Farquhar, Rayford)
March 18, 2019 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge William G. Young added. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
March 18, 2019 Filing 29 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE entered. Pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(i)(1) and with the consent of Judge Young, this case is REASSIGNED to Judge Young as he presided over the underlying criminal case. (Simeone, Maria)
March 18, 2019 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $400.00 paid on 03/15/2019, receipt number 0101-7586606. (Tran, Henry)
March 15, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION re #17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Ernesto Arroyo by Stephanie Dipierro. (Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION re #17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Alexander Yale Walley, MD, MSc by Stephanie Dipierro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION re #17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Richard N. Rosenthal, M.D. by Stephanie Dipierro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42)(Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION re #17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Ruth A. Potee, M.D. by Stephanie Dipierro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J)(Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION re #17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Carolynn B. Melvin by Stephanie Dipierro. (Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION re #17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Ross MacDonald, M.D. by Stephanie Dipierro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION re #17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Rose Ann Berwald, M.D. by Stephanie Dipierro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION re #17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Ciriaco DiPierro by Stephanie Dipierro. (Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION re #17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Stephanie DiPierro by Stephanie Dipierro. (Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION re #17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Robert Frederickson III by Stephanie Dipierro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Frederickson, Robert) (Main Document 19 replaced on 3/19/2019) (Paine, Matthew). (Attachment 7 replaced on 3/19/2019) (Paine, Matthew).
March 15, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Stephanie Dipierro. (Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Stephanie Dipierro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of Stephanie Dipierro (Segal, Matthew)
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 Set Deadlines: Complete Service by 6/13/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Hugh J. Hurwitz, Deborah G. Schult. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessie J. Rossman on behalf of Stephanie Dipierro (Rossman, Jessie)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christine Armellino. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Alexandra D. Valenti. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ira Levy. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christine Armellino Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7587060 by Stephanie Dipierro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Tiffany Mahmood. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alexandra D. Valenti Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7586906 by Stephanie Dipierro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ira J. Levy Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7586873 by Stephanie Dipierro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tiffany Mahmood Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7586754 by Stephanie Dipierro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Pacho, Arnold)
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
March 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Frederickson, III on behalf of Stephanie Dipierro (Frederickson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Emergency Injunctive Relief against Deborah G. Schult, Hugh J. Hurwitz Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7586655 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Stephanie Dipierro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet)(Frederickson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiPierro v. Hurwitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh J. Hurwitz
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah G. Schult
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Dipierro
Represented By: Christine Armellino
Represented By: Robert Frederickson, III
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Ira J. Levy
Represented By: Jessie J. Rossman
Represented By: Tiffany Mahmood
Represented By: Alexandra D. Valenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?