Higgins v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Marsha Higgins
Defendant: Speedway LLC and Realty Income Corporation
Not Yet Classified: Judge M. Page Kelley
Case Number: 1:2019cv10509
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge M. Page Kelley appointed.(Garvin, Brendan)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution as of January 2020.(Paine, Matthew)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Marsha Higgins.(Hughes, Stephen)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Realty Income Corporation, Speedway LLC.(DiSarra, Luana)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Scheduling Conference held on 4/9/2019. The Court explains the requirements of the session. The parties do not want to proceed before a magistrate judge. The case is to go to ADR during the month of January 2020 and is placed on the running trial list for the month of May 2020. A final pretrial conference will be held during the month of April 2020. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed atleast three months prior to trial month. A joint pretrial memo is due the first Monday of the month preceding trial month. (Ready for Trial on 5/4/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.) (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. re #7 JOINT STATEMENT is so ordered as modified as the case management scheduling order. DISCOVERY DUE April 15, 2020 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE February 1, 2020. (Paine, Matthew)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (DiSarra, Luana)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT Record. (DiSarra, Luana)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 4/9/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 Defendants, Speedway LLC and Realty Income Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Realty Income Corporation, Speedway LLC.(DiSarra, Luana)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McKillop, Matthew)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Speedway LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7589566 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Category Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Coversheet)(DiSarra, Luana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgins v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Luana DiSarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realty Income Corporation
Represented By: Luana DiSarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Higgins
Represented By: Stephen M. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Judge M. Page Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?