Kaba v. Souza
Petitioner: Musa Kaba
Respondent: Steve Souza, Todd Lyons and Thomas Hodgson
Case Number: 1:2019cv10511
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 Copy re 10 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order to Hold Petition in Abeyance, #11 Order Dismissing Case mailed to Musa Kaba on 4/26/2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying Petitioner's #9 Motion to Hold Petition in Abeyance without prejudice to refiling. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Hold #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) in Abeyance by Musa Kaba. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Steve Souza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Balakrishna, Annapurna)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Steve Souza.(Balakrishna, Annapurna)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBIT Letters to ICE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Musa Kaba by Musa Kaba. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Petition) (Pacho, Arnold)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Annapurna Balakrishna on behalf of Steve Souza (Balakrishna, Annapurna)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. The clerk shall serve a copy of the petition. The sole respondent is Superintendent Steven Souza and the respondent shall, within 21 days of the date of this order, respond to the petition. The answer or responsive pleading is due no later than 21 days from receipt of this order. If Kaba wishes to proceed with this action, within 21 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, he must file a signed copy of the petition. Unless otherwise ordered by the court, during the pendency of this action the respondent shall not transfer Kaba outside of the District of Massachusetts unless it is to effectuate his removal. For purposes of this order, effectuating removal includes, but is not limited to, travel for interviews, procedures, meetings, or other events where Kabas presence is necessary for the anticipated procurement of travel documents. The respondent shall promptly notify the court if Kaba is moved outside of the District of Massachusetts, the reason therefor, and, if applicable, the projected date of Kabas return to the District of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 IFP application form)(PSSA, 4) Modified on 3/19/2019 (PSSA, 4). (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/19/2019) (PSSA, 4).
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (adminn, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Musa Kaba.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaba v. Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Souza
Represented By: Annapurna Balakrishna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Hodgson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Musa Kaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?