Siena Analytics, Inc. v. NIELSEN et al

Plaintiff: Siena Analytics, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary Kirstjen M NIELSEN and Director Laura B. Zuchowski
Case Number: 1:2019cv10521
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Siena Analytics, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica P. Driscoll on behalf of Kirstjen M NIELSEN, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Laura B. Zuchowski (Driscoll, Jessica)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Siena Analytics, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony) (Main Document 8 replaced on 3/29/2019) (McKillop, Matthew).
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Siena Analytics, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/29/2019) (McKillop, Matthew).
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Siena Analytics, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/29/2019) (McKillop, Matthew).
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Siena Analytics, Inc.. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 3/21/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Drago, Anthony) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/29/2019) (McKillop, Matthew).
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kirstjen M NIELSEN, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Laura B. Zuchowski. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Jones, Sherry)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7592173 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Siena Analytics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Category Form, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drago, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siena Analytics, Inc. v. NIELSEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jessica P. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Jessica P. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen M NIELSEN
Represented By: Jessica P. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Laura B. Zuchowski
Represented By: Jessica P. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siena Analytics, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Drago, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?