Cape Waterman, Inc. v. M/V AVA PEARL (O.N. 1238374) et al

Plaintiff: Cape Waterman, Inc.
Defendant: Rhode Island Fast Ferry, Inc. and M/V AVA PEARL (O.N. 1238374)
Case Number: 1:2019cv10523
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2019. (Simeone, Maria)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Defendants' Assented-To Motion to Amend to Raise Counterclaim, to file Third Party Verified Complaint and the Plaintiff to File a Motion to File a Fourth Party Complaint. (Montes, Mariliz)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION to Amend Answer to Raise Counter-Claim, to File Third Party Verified Complaint and for the Plaintiff to file a Motion to File a Fourth Party Complaint by M/V AVA PEARL (O.N. 1238374). (Attachments: #1 Defts' Answer to Pltf's Verified Complaint and Counterclaim for Negligence-Negligent Salvage, #2 Deft's Third Party Verified Complaint)(Collins, Robert)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: SCHEDULING ORDER entered.(Simeone, Maria)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Scheduling Conference held on 6/12/2019; Counsel state the status of the case. The court goes over the proposed joint statement, finds it reasonable and adopts the schedule as an order of the court. Initial disclosures by 6/26/19. Amendments by 6/26/19. Fact discovery by 9/30/19. A status conference has been set for 9/4/19 at 2:00pm. Experts to be completed by 1/3/20. Dispositive motions by 2/3/20. If the parties would like to participate in the courts mediation program, counsel may contact the clerk for an order referring them. Defense counsel informs the court they intend to bring a counterclaim for damages to the ship., ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/26/2019., Discovery to be completed by 9/30/2019, Motions due by 2/3/2020), ( Status Conference set for 9/4/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.), Set Deadlines/Hearing as to. (Court Reporter: NO SELECTION MADE.) (Simeone, Maria)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Cape Waterman, Inc.. Document received: Proposed Scheduling Order. (Smith, David)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Disclosure of Owner's Statement of Right or Interest Pursuant to Supplemental Rule C(6) by Rhode Island Fast Ferry, Inc..(Muzyka, Thomas) Modified on 6/12/2019 (Simeone, Maria).
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference; A Scheduling Conference has been set for 6/12/2019 03:15 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2019: #1 Scheduling order sample, #2 Standing order on summary judgment) (Simeone, Maria).
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by M/V AVA PEARL (O.N. 1238374), Rhode Island Fast Ferry, Inc..(Muzyka, Thomas)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Muzyka on behalf of M/V AVA PEARL (O.N. 1238374), Rhode Island Fast Ferry, Inc. (Muzyka, Thomas)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Collins on behalf of M/V AVA PEARL (O.N. 1238374), Rhode Island Fast Ferry, Inc. (Collins, Robert)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Cape Waterman, Inc.. All Defendants. Acknowledgment filed by Cape Waterman, Inc.. (Smith, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service completed by 6/18/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to M/V AVA PEARL (O.N. 1238374), Rhode Island Fast Ferry, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7593436 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Cape Waterman, Inc, d/b/a Sea Tow Cape & Islands. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS45)(Smith, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cape Waterman, Inc. v. M/V AVA PEARL (O.N. 1238374) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island Fast Ferry, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J Muzyka
Represented By: Robert E. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V AVA PEARL (O.N. 1238374)
Represented By: Thomas J Muzyka
Represented By: Robert E. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cape Waterman, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?