Radiant Global Logistics, Inc. d/b/a Airgroup v. Royal Contract Lighting, Inc.

Plaintiff: Radiant Glabal Logistics, Inc. and Radiant Global Logistics, Inc. d/b/a Airgroup
Defendant: Royal Contract Lighting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10525
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: CLOSING ORDER entered. re #13 Default Judgment (Simeone, Maria)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Radiant Global Logistics (Simeone, Maria)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Default Judgment as to Royal Contract Lighting (Simeone, Maria)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Royal Contract Lighting, Inc. by Radiant Glabal Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Chused, Wesley)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 Mail sent to Royal Contract Lighting, Inc. re. #9 Notice of Entry of Default: Mail Returned as Undeliverable. (Montes, Mariliz)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Royal Contract Lighting, Inc. (Attachments: #1 standing order)(Simeone, Maria)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 Request for notice of default by Radiant Glabal Logistics, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A to Wesley S. Chused Affidavit in Support)(Chused, Wesley)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Radiant Glabal Logistics, Inc. served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Chused, Wesley)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Sonneborn on behalf of Radiant Glabal Logistics, Inc. (Sonneborn, Daniel)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Set/Reset Deadlines: Service to be completed by 6/18/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Royal Contract Lighting, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Radiant Global Logistics, Inc. d/b/a Airgroup. (Chused, Wesley)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Royal Contract Lighting, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7593585 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Radiant Global Logistics, Inc. d/b/a Airgroup. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Chused, Wesley) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/20/2019) (Jones, Sherry).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radiant Global Logistics, Inc. d/b/a Airgroup v. Royal Contract Lighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Contract Lighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radiant Glabal Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Wesley S. Chused
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radiant Global Logistics, Inc. d/b/a Airgroup
Represented By: Wesley S. Chused
Represented By: Daniel R. Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?