Rosenberg v. LoanDepot.com LLC et al
Plaintiff: Douglas E. Rosenberg
Defendant: John Doe Corporation, LoanDepot.com LLC, Ascend Marketing, Inc. and Ascend Marketing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10661
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 28 Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Name by Douglas E. Rosenberg.(Paronich, Anthony)
July 10, 2019 Filing 27 Opposition re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Non-Massachusetts Putative Class Members filed by Douglas E. Rosenberg. (Paronich, Anthony)
July 9, 2019 Filing 26 Opposition re #23 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations filed by Douglas E. Rosenberg. (Paronich, Anthony)
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Non-Massachusetts Putative Class Members by LoanDepot.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of LoanDepot's Motion to Dismiss Non-Massachusetts Putative Class Members)(Kirby, Kelly)
July 8, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by LoanDepot.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of LoanDepot's Motion to Dismiss)(Kirby, Kelly)
July 8, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations by LoanDepot.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Allegations)(Kirby, Kelly)
July 2, 2019 Filing 22 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #21 Motion to Substitute Party. Ascend Marketing, Inc. added. Ascend Marketing, LLC terminated (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION to Substitute Party by Douglas E. Rosenberg.(Paronich, Anthony)
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 AMENDED COMPLAINT. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 Motion Of Extension Of Time To Respond To First Amended Complaint by LoanDepot.com LLC. (Mastrocola, Paul) Modified on 6/25/2019 to change event type (Vieira, Leonardo).
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #10 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Duguid v. Facebook Inc., 2019 U.S. App. Lexis 17675)(Paronich, Anthony)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered DENYING as moot without prejudice #8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; DENYING as moot without prejudice #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; DENYING as moot without prejudice #11 Motion to Strike. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Ascend Marketing, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lima, Christine)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Douglas E. Rosenberg. (Paronich, Anthony)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #11 MOTION to Strike Class, #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #13 Amended Complaint, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Douglas E. Rosenberg. (Paronich, Anthony)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against LoanDepot.com LLC, Ascend Marketing, LLC, filed by Douglas E. Rosenberg.(Paronich, Anthony)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly M. Kirby on behalf of LoanDepot.com LLC (Kirby, Kelly)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike Class by LoanDepot.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of loanDepot.com's Motion to Strike Class)(Mastrocola, Paul)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay by LoanDepot.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of loanDepot.com's Motion to Stay)(Mastrocola, Paul)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by LoanDepot.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of loanDepot.com's Motion to Dismiss)(Mastrocola, Paul)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by LoanDepot.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of loanDepot.com's Motion to Dismiss Non-Massachusetts Putative Class Members)(Mastrocola, Paul)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Douglas E. Rosenberg. (Paronich, Anthony)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed LoanDepot.com LLC served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Paronich, Anthony)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex M. Washkowitz on behalf of Douglas E. Rosenberg (Washkowitz, Alex)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Doe Corporation, LoanDepot.com LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7624383 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Douglas E. Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Civil Category Form)(Paronich, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenberg v. LoanDepot.com LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanDepot.com LLC
Represented By: Kelly M. Kirby
Represented By: Paul R. Mastrocola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascend Marketing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascend Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas E. Rosenberg
Represented By: Anthony I. Paronich
Represented By: Alex M. Washkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?