Pan et al v. Zuchowski et al

Plaintiff: Mr. Jiehao Pan
Defendant: Director L. Francis Cissna, USCIS, DHS (Department of Homeland Security), Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan and Director Laura B. Zuchowski
Case Number: 1:2019cv10675
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING Joint Motion to Stay Proceeding #15 . (Kinsella, Devan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceeding by L. Francis Cissna, DHS (Department of Homeland Security), Kevin McAleenan, USCIS, Laura B. Zuchowski.(Poswistilo, Susan)
May 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Poswistilo on behalf of L. Francis Cissna, DHS (Department of Homeland Security), Kevin McAleenan, USCIS, Laura B. Zuchowski (Poswistilo, Susan)
April 16, 2019 Filing 13 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jiehao Pan. (Bless, Jesse)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jiehao Pan. (Bless, Jesse)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jiehao Pan. (Bless, Jesse)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jiehao Pan. (Bless, Jesse)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jiehao Pan. (Bless, Jesse)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jiehao Pan. (Bless, Jesse)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Jiehao Pan. Andrew E Lelling served on 4/11/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Bless, Jesse)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse M. Bless on behalf of Jiehao Pan (Bless, Jesse)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kinsella, Devan)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pan et al v. Zuchowski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS (Department of Homeland Security)
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Laura B. Zuchowski
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Jiehao Pan
Represented By: Jesse M. Bless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?