ACLU of Massachusetts v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2019cv10690
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/26/2019. summary judgment Motions due by 8/16/2019. Cross Motion/Responses due by 9/13/2019, Opposition/Replies due by 9/25/2019. (Simeone, Maria)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The proposed joint schedule, Doc. No. 10, is ADOPTED as the scheduling order and the Rule 16 conference set for June 12, 2019 is CANCELLED at the request of the parties. re #10 Joint submission filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc., ORDER Canceling Deadline(Montes, Mariliz)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc..(McFadden, Daniel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc..(McFadden, Daniel)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica J. Lewis on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc. (Lewis, Jessica)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference; A Scheduling Conference has been set for 6/12/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 scheduling order sample, #2 standing order re summary judgment)(Simeone, Maria)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Poswistilo, Susan)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc.. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. Acknowledgement filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc.. (McFadden, Daniel)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (McFadden, Daniel)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc. (Segal, Matthew)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7630509 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by ACLU of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Category Sheet)(McFadden, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACLU of Massachusetts v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Jessica J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?