Powell v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Liza Powell
Defendant: Acadia Crescent Plaza, LLC and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10691
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Amal Bala on behalf of Liza Powell (Bala, Amal)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Plymouth Superior Court by Liza Powell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Bala, Amal)
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 STATE COURT Record. (Lapish, Caroline)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Liza Powell. Acadia Crescent Plaza, LLC served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Liza Powell. (George, Brian)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Lapish, Caroline)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email.(Burgos, Sandra)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet *Corrected* by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Lapish, Caroline)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Lapish, Caroline)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly L. Martin Malone on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Martin Malone, Kelly)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Lapish, Caroline)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7630500 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lapish, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadia Crescent Plaza, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Caroline B. Lapish
Represented By: Kelly L. Martin Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Powell
Represented By: Brian F. George
Represented By: Amal Bala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?