Auctus Fund, LLC et al v. Omagine, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Auctus Fund, LLC and EMA Financial, LLC
Defendant: Omagine, Inc. and Journey of Light, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10700
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed Journey of Light, Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Giordano, Philip)
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Charles P. Kuczynski in Support re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Omagine, Inc.. (Halley, Taylor)
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #17 MOTION to Strike #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Certificate of Service with Certificate of Service filed by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Giordano, Philip)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Certificate of Service by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate)(Giordano, Philip)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Omagine, Inc..(Halley, Taylor)
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Journey of Light, Inc. served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Giordano, Philip)
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Omagine, Inc. served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Giordano, Philip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 13 Emergency MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service, #12 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment and Attachment of Defendant's Assets, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service, #4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service, #7 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment and Attachment of Defendants' Assets, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service, #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Equitable Relief as to Specific Performance on Conversion of Debt into Public Shares of Defendant, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service,, #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance Compelling Conversion of Debt Into Publicly Traded Shares of Defendant, with Certificate of Service with Certificate of Service filed by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Giordano, Philip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment and Attachment of Defendant's Assets, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Attachment of Defendants' Assets)(Giordano, Philip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 Emergency MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service, #4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service, #7 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment and Attachment of Defendants' Assets, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service, #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Equitable Relief as to Specific Performance on Conversion of Debt into Public Shares of Defendant, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service,, #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance Compelling Conversion of Debt Into Publicly Traded Shares of Defendant, with Certificate of Service with Certificate of Service filed by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Giordano, Philip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Equitable Relief as to Specific Performance on Conversion of Debt into Public Shares of Defendant, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service, by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Louis Posner, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Affidavit of Philip M. Giordano, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit B-2, #6 Exhibit B-3, #7 Exhibit D-1, #8 Exhibit D-2, #9 Exhibit D-3, #10 Exhibit D-4, #11 Exhibit D-5, #12 Text of Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction and Equitable Relief of Specific Performance)(Giordano, Philip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service by Auctus Fund, LLC.(Giordano, Philip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 Emergency MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service, #7 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment and Attachment of Defendants' Assets, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service, #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance Compelling Conversion of Debt Into Publicly Traded Shares of Defendant, with Certificate of Service with Certificate of Service filed by EMA Financial, LLC. (Giordano, Philip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment and Attachment of Defendants' Assets, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service by EMA Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Attachment of Defendants' Assets)(Giordano, Philip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 Emergency MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service, #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance Compelling Conversion of Debt Into Publicly Traded Shares of Defendant, with Certificate of Service with Certificate of Service filed by EMA Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Giordano, Philip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance Compelling Conversion of Debt Into Publicly Traded Shares of Defendant, with Certificate of Service by EMA Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Felicia Preston, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Affidavit of Philip M. Giordano, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3, #7 Exhibit D-1, #8 Exhibit D-2, #9 Exhibit D-3, #10 Exhibit D-4, #11 Exhibit D-5, #12 Text of Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction and Specific Performance Compelling Conversion)(Giordano, Philip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service by EMA Financial, LLC.(Giordano, Philip)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7633485 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit B-2, #6 Exhibit B-3, #7 Exhibit C-1, #8 Exhibit C-2, #9 Exhibit C-3, #10 Exhibit D-1, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #12 JS45 Category Sheet)(Giordano, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auctus Fund, LLC et al v. Omagine, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auctus Fund, LLC
Represented By: Philip M. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMA Financial, LLC
Represented By: Philip M. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omagine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Journey of Light, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?