Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v. v. Steel Barge CHRISTY 400 et al

Plaintiff: Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v.
Defendant: Moravia Steel, A.S., Steel Barge CHRISTY 400, Jay Cashman, Inc., Th. Boe & Son A/S, Sterling Equipment, Inc. and Macgregor Sweden, AB
Case Number: 1:2019cv10706
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Referring Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Macgregor Sweden, AB, Th. Boe & Son A/S. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Putnam, Harold)
July 10, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
July 9, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler added. Judge William G. Young no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jay Cashman, Inc., Macgregor Sweden, AB, Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v., Steel Barge CHRISTY 400, Sterling Equipment, Inc., Th. Boe & Son A/S.. (Paine, Matthew)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger L. Smerage on behalf of Jay Cashman, Inc., Sterling Equipment, Inc. (Smerage, Roger)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Scheduling Statement. (Hewig, William)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 plaintiff ANSWER to Crossclaim Jay Cashman, Inc., Plaintiff ANSWER to Counterclaim Jay Cashman, Inc., Plaintiff ANSWER to Counterclaim Sterling Equipment, Inc., Plaintiff ANSWER to Crossclaim Sterling Equipment, Inc. by Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v..(Hewig, William)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #11 Amended Complaint, , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #11 Amended Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v., COUNTERCLAIM against Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v. by Sterling Equipment, Inc..(McCormick, Kirk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #11 Amended Complaint, , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #11 Amended Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v., COUNTERCLAIM against Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v. by Jay Cashman, Inc..(McCormick, Kirk)
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Release of Vessel and Cargo by Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hewig, William)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT Verified First against Steel Barge CHRISTY 400,Macgregor Sweden, AB, Th. Boe & Son A/S, Jay Cashman, Inc., Sterling Equipment, Inc. filed by Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v..(Hewig, William) (Modified on 4/19/2019 to Correct Docket Text and Correct Defendants Listed in the Amended Complaint) (Paine, Matthew).
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2019; The court hears counsel on the motions and allows them in open court. re #4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem Warrant of Arrest filed by Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v., #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian filed by Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v., #3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem of Arrest filed by Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v., #6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Substitute of In Rem Serving Officer filed by Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v.. (Court Reporter: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 IN REM WARRANT of Arrest issued on April 12, 2019. (Paine, Matthew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem; granting #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian ; granting #6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Substitute of In Rem Serving Officer (Paine, Matthew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Substitute of In Rem Serving Officer by Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v..(Hewig, William) (Modified on 4/12/2019 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hewig, William) (Modified on 4/12/2019 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED Warrant of Arrest by Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v..(Hewig, William) (Modified on 4/12/2019 to Correct Docket Text and Terminate Motion) (Paine, Matthew).
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem of Arrest by Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v..(Hewig, William)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES by Plaintiff Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0101-7634561. Payment Type : INITIATING DOCUMENT. (Hewig, William)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v. (Fee Status: Seaman), filed by Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Catagory Form)(Hewig, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v. v. Steel Barge CHRISTY 400 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moravia Steel, A.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Barge CHRISTY 400
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Cashman, Inc.
Represented By: Roger L. Smerage
Represented By: Kirk J. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Th. Boe & Son A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Roger L. Smerage
Represented By: Kirk J. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macgregor Sweden, AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onego Shipping & Chartering, b.v.
Represented By: William Hewig, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?