CSP, Inc. v. Platform9, Inc.
Plaintiff: CSP, Inc.
Defendant: Platform9, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10707
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by CSP, Inc.. (Panarella, Merriann)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Platform9, Inc. answer/response due 7/1/2019. (Paine, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 1, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Platform9, Inc..(McMahon, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Assented-to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Platform9, Inc. answer and/or Respone due 6/24/2019. (Paine, Matthew)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. Gershenson on behalf of Platform9, Inc. (Gershenson, Adam)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 24, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Platform9, Inc..(McMahon, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. McMahon on behalf of Platform9, Inc. (McMahon, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CSP, Inc.. Platform9, Inc. waiver sent on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Panarella, Merriann)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7634718 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by CSP, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Panarella, Merriann) Modified on 4/12/2019 to correct who the document is filed on behalf of (Coppola, Katelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSP, Inc. v. Platform9, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSP, Inc.
Represented By: Merriann M. Panarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platform9, Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Gershenson
Represented By: Michael J. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?