Principal National Life Insurance Company v. Chen

Plaintiff: Principal National Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Lu Di Chen
Case Number: 1:2019cv10710
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris added. Judge George A. OToole, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Pursuant to Local Rule 40.1, I recuse myself from participation in this matter and direct the Clerk forthwith to reassign the case randomly to another District Judge.(Halley, Taylor)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lu Di Chen. (Lara, Miguel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lu Di Chen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lara, Miguel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lu Di Chen served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Russman, David)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lu Di Chen Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7634909 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Principal National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Russman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Principal National Life Insurance Company v. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David P. Russman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lu Di Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?