In re. Christmas Oaks Development and Management, LLC et al
Appellee: Sedona Realty Group, LLC, Lancaster Oaks Development, LLC and Joseph M. Rizzari
Trustee: John Fitzgerald and John Aquino
Appellant: Christmas Oaks Development and Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10714
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 Opposition re #8 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Lancaster Oaks Development, LLC. (Feinman, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Opposition re #7 MOTION to Stay filed by Lancaster Oaks Development, LLC. (Feinman, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 Brief of the Debtor -Appellant by Christmas Oaks Development and Management, LLC.( The Brief and the appendix of the brief are bound and will be held in the records room of the clerks office) (Halley, Taylor)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 CHRISTMAS OAKS DEVELOPMENT AND MANAGEMENT LLC'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER 18 U.S.C. 156 & 157 by Christmas Oaks Development and Management, LLC.(Halley, Taylor)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 CHRISTMAS OAKS DEVELOPMENT AND MANAGEMENT, LLC'S MOTION TO STAY BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS by Christmas Oaks Development and Management, LLC.(Halley, Taylor)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Correcting Filing Dates: Bankruptcy Scheduling Order. Appellant Brief due by 6/14/2019. Appellee Brief due by 7/19/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 8/2/2019. (Halley, Taylor)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order. Appellant Brief due by 5/24/2019. Appellee Brief due by 6/7/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 6/21/2019. (Halley, Taylor)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Halley, Taylor)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-14611. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re. Christmas Oaks Development and Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sedona Realty Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael B. Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lancaster Oaks Development, LLC
Represented By: Michael B. Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joseph M. Rizzari
Represented By: Michael B. Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John Aquino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Christmas Oaks Development and Management, LLC
Represented By: C. Peter R. Gossels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?