Olukayode v. Gatestone & Co. International Inc et al

Plaintiff: Olukayode Walter Oluwole
Defendant: Gatestone & Co. International Inc and DOES 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 1:2019cv10718
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Olukayode Walter Oluwole (Lemberg, Sergei)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: 60 DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND CLOSING ORDER entered. (Simeone, Maria)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Olukayode Walter Oluwole (Lemberg, Sergei)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Set Deadlines: Complete Service by 7/15/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Removed. Issued in duplicate by court staff. (See Doc. No. 3)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1-10, inclusive, Gatestone & Co. International Inc Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7636317 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Oluwole Walter Olukayode. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Lemberg, Sergei)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olukayode v. Gatestone & Co. International Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatestone & Co. International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olukayode Walter Oluwole
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?