LeTendre v. Lowell General Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline LeTendre
Defendant: Lowell General Hospital and Maureen Fitzpatrick
Not Yet Classified: Judge Donald L. Cabell
Case Number: 1:2019cv10722
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #17 Joint MOTION to Continue ADR Conference. The July 30th mediation is cancelled, however, the parties shall file a status report by cob September 18, 2019 and, if mediation is sought, provide several dates the parties are available. (Russo, Noreen)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Continue ADR Conference to September 30, 2019 by Maureen Fitzpatrick, Lowell General Hospital.(Jewell, Jessica)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. NOTICE OF AND ORDER WITH RESPECT TO MEDIATION. Mediation set for 7/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. Please see the attached order for full details and requirements. The parties shall exchange settlement proposals by no later than July 16, 2019 and inform the court immediately if they no longer believe it would be fruitful to hold the mediation. Confidential Mediation Statements are due by cob July 22, 2019. (Russo, Noreen)
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Donald L. Cabell appointed.(Garvin, Brendan)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for July 2019.(Molloy, Maryellen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 13 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: Scheduling Conference held on 5/14/2019. Joint Statement - Adopted. Written Discovery 11/29/19; Dispositive Motions 1/13/20; Opposition due 2/27/20; Reply briefs 3/19/20; see joint statement for further details. Parties agree to refer matter to ADR for JULY 2019 (Atty Plaza, Schachter Jewell)(Court Reporter: no court reporter used) (Molloy, Maryellen)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Jacqueline LeTendre.(Plaza, Margaret)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Plaza, Margaret)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Jewell, Jessica)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Jewell, Jessica)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Jewell, Jessica)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Maureen Fitzpatrick, Lowell General Hospital.(Jewell, Jessica)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacie B. Collier on behalf of Maureen Fitzpatrick, Lowell General Hospital (Collier, Stacie)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.... Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowell General Hospital identifying Corporate Parent Circle Health, Inc. for Lowell General Hospital.. (Jewell, Jessica)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Maureen Fitzpatrick, Lowell General Hospital ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7636655 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Service of Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Jewell, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeTendre v. Lowell General Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowell General Hospital
Represented By: Jessica Schachter Jewell
Represented By: Stacie B. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Jessica Schachter Jewell
Represented By: Stacie B. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline LeTendre
Represented By: Margaret G. Plaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Judge Donald L. Cabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?