Rogers v. Cigna Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Coleman Rogers
Defendant: Analog Devices, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America, Cigna Corporation and Analog Devices, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10725
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Parsons, Katherine)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coleman Rogers. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Rafik, Mala)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Cigna Corporation by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Parsons, Katherine)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal of the Plan by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Parsons, Katherine)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Parsons, Katherine)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine R. Parsons on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Parsons, Katherine)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Crevier on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Crevier, David)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7637131 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Coleman Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Rafik, Mala)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Cigna Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Analog Devices, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Katherine R. Parsons
Represented By: David B. Crevier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Analog Devices, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coleman Rogers
Represented By: Mala M. Rafik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?