Berkley Specialty Insurance Company V. N.E. Patriot Tire, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Berkley Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Martin Gulloto, Imelda Tropilini-Hallilaj, Arsi Dhozi, Florenc Hallilaj and N.E. Patriot Tire, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10726
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference REset for 7/17/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference REset for 6/26/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle F. Wehrli on behalf of Arsi Dhozi, Florenc Hallilaj, Imelda Tropilini-Hallilaj (Wehrli, Danielle)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/12/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon E. Feener on behalf of Arsi Dhozi, Florenc Hallilaj, Imelda Tropilini-Hallilaj (Feener, Gordon)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon E. Feener on behalf of Arsi Dhozi, Florenc Hallilaj, Imelda Tropilini-Hallilaj (Feener, Gordon)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Arsi Dhozi, Florenc Hallilaj, Imelda Tropilini-Hallilaj.(Feener, Gordon)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Martin Gulloto.(Wood, Daniel)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by N.E. Patriot Tire, Inc..(Wood, Daniel)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Imelda Tropilini-Hallilaj served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Aylward, Michael)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Martin Gulloto served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Aylward, Michael)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Florenc Hallilaj served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Aylward, Michael)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed N.E. Patriot Tire, Inc. served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Aylward, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7637474 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by BERKLEY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY F/K/A BERKLEY REGIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Berkley Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Aylward, Michael) (Attachment 4 replaced on 4/17/2019) (Vieira, Leonardo). Modified on 4/17/2019 to upload updated category sheet (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkley Specialty Insurance Company V. N.E. Patriot Tire, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Gulloto
Represented By: Daniel J. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imelda Tropilini-Hallilaj
Represented By: Gordon E. Feener
Represented By: Danielle F. Wehrli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arsi Dhozi
Represented By: Gordon E. Feener
Represented By: Danielle F. Wehrli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florenc Hallilaj
Represented By: Gordon E. Feener
Represented By: Danielle F. Wehrli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.E. Patriot Tire, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkley Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael F. Aylward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?