Cleary v. Boston Harbor Cruises, Inc.

Plaintiff: L. Christopher Cleary
Defendant: Boston Harbor Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10731
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Referring Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Boston Harbor Cruises, Inc..(Blatchley, Samuel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge (Bond, Thomas). (Modified on 6/19/2019 to better describe attached document) (Dambrosio, Jolyne).
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC REMINDER TO COUNSEL: A notification form indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been filed. Submission of the form is mandatory and a completed form should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by L. Christopher Cleary. All Defendants. (Bond, Thomas)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Murphy on behalf of Boston Harbor Cruises, Inc. (Murphy, Robert)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel P. Blatchley on behalf of Boston Harbor Cruises, Inc. (Blatchley, Samuel)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boston Harbor Cruises, Inc. (Fee Status: Seaman), filed by L. Christopher Cleary. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Affidavit)(Bond, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/17/2019 to upload document with attorneys signature) (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleary v. Boston Harbor Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Harbor Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel P. Blatchley
Represented By: Robert J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. Christopher Cleary
Represented By: Thomas M. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?