National Consumer Law Center v. United States Department of Education
Plaintiff: National Consumer Law Center
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2019cv10739
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The status conference set for 7/9/2019 is OFF. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
June 23, 2019 Filing 11 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer United States Department of Education answer due 8/22/2019. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Corrected version filed.) (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Corrected) by United States Department of Education.(Johnson, Anita)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/22/2019 to File Answer by United States Department of Education.(Johnson, Anita)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 7/9/2019 11:10 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Bono, Christine)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by National Consumer Law Center. United States Department of Education served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. Acknowledgement filed by National Consumer Law Center. (Yu, Persis)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of United States Department of Education (Johnson, Anita)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart T. Rossman on behalf of National Consumer Law Center (Rossman, Stuart)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Education. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT National Consumer Law Center against Department of Education Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7641148 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by National Consumer Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet NCLC Civil Cover Sheet, #2 NCLC Category Form)(Yu, Persis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Consumer Law Center v. United States Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Consumer Law Center
Represented By: Stuart T. Rossman
Represented By: Persis S. Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?